Gann v. Neotti et al

Plaintiff: John David Gann
Defendant: George A Neotti, G Pederson, B Morris, M Virgen and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2009cv01703
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Overruling 47 Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; (2) Adopting re 34 Report and Recommendations; (3) Finding as Moot 35 Motion to Dismiss; (4) Granting in Part and Denying in Part [49 ] Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint; (5) Finding as Moot 19 Motion to Dismiss; and (6) Denying 21 Motion to Supplement the Complaint. The Court directs the Clerk to file the proposed Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 49-1) as the ope rative complaint, and to add D.R. Morris, A.L. Cota, E. Romero, A. Llamas, M. Chacon, and J. McGee as Defendants in this matter. The Court strikes the following from the third amended complaint: Additional Defendants E. Franklin, D.K. McBride, and P. Cowan, Plaintiff's First Cause of Action, and Paragraphs 9, 11, 18 and 50. Defendants already joined in this action shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint by 7/12/2010. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/15/2010. (Pro Per Package Prepared as to new defendants only) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
May 20, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Eighth, and Fourteenth Amendment Claims for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies; and Denying 44 Motion for Reconsider ation of Order Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel. For good cause shown, the Court grants Plaintiff 60 days from the date of the original hearing date to file an opposition to the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must file her Response in Opposition by 6/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/20/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 22, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Denying Request to Add Co-Plaintiff; and Directing Clerk to Issue Summons and USM to Effect Service of Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Second A mended Complaint submitted by Plaintiff in conjunction with his Motion, and to add E. Marrero, Correctional Captain, W. Beauchemin, Correctional Lieutenant, and W. Liles, Correctional Sergeant, as Defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/22/2009. (Pro Per Package Mailed) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gann v. Neotti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A Neotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Virgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?