Green v. AT&T Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Antony Green
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc. and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv01760
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of dismissal. The Joint Motion for Dismissal is granted 12 , and Plaintiff's individual claims are dismissed with prejudice, and the Class Claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/26/2010. (tkl)
January 4, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 2/3/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/4/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
December 4, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 joint Motion for Extension of Time for dft AT&T Services, Inc. to plead in response to plaintiff's complaint to 1/4/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/4/09. (tkl) (kaj).
October 29, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 joint Motion for Extension of Time for Dft to Answer to Plaintiff's complaint. AT&T Services, Inc. answer due 12/4/2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/29/09. (tkl)(jrl).
October 1, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for extension of time for Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. answer by 11/4/2009 to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/1/09. (tkl) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. AT&T Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antony Green
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?