Copeland v. Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB et al

Plaintiff: Scott Copeland
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB, Moneyworld Sales/Mortgages, Inc, Aurora Loan Services, All other claimants of whatsoever kind and character and DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2009cv01774
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 42 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. The (Doc. 43 ) Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File an Opposition to Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 25 Pages is granted. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB and Aurora Loan Services, Inc. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/3/2011. (mdc)
July 15, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 27 ) Motion to Dismiss. The First Amended Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice as to Defendants Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB and Aurora Loan Services, Inc. No later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint, accompanied by a proposed second amended complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/15/2010. (srm)
April 7, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 14 ) Motion to Amend Complaint is granted, and the (Doc. 22 ) Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint in Excess of 10 Pages is granted. No later than 14 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff may file the proposed first amended complaint which is attached to the Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/7/2010. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Copeland
Represented By: Lincoln B Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moneyworld Sales/Mortgages, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All other claimants of whatsoever kind and character
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?