Dennis v Kellogg Company

Plaintiff: Harry Dennis
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv01786
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/13/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
November 14, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting 101 Motion for Final Settlement Approval, Attorneys' Fees and Incentive Awards; Granting Certification of the Settlement Class; Overruling all Objections and Denying Objector's Request for Attorney Fees. Upon motion of the parties 137 , the Order of September 10, 2013 115 is hereby vacated and replaced with this Amended Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/14/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
September 10, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in its entirety Plaintiffs' 101 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Attorneys' Fees, and Incentive Awards. Court grants final settlement approval, grants certification of the settlement class, grants class counsel 9;s request for attorneys' fees and costs, and grants the requested incentive awards to the class representatives. Court overrules all objections. Objector's request for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/10/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
May 3, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 90 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Settlement Class is preliminarily certified. Court appoints Class Counsel to represent the Class. Court preliminarily approves the Stipulation and the terms and conditions of settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 7/30/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Irma E. Gonzalez. Class members must file any objections to the proposed settlement no later than 30 days prior to the Settlement Hearing. Opening papers in support of Settlement and any application for fee and expense award and/or class respresentative incentive awards must be filed 45 days prior to the Settlement Hearing. Court approves the form amd method of class notice. Court approves designation of Garden City Griup, Inc. to serve as the Court-appointed Calss Action Settlement Administrator for the settlement. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/3/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
August 10, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 61 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Rule 7 Appeal Bond and (2) denying as moot 62 Plaintiffs' Request to Summarily Grant the Rule 7 Appeal Bond. Plaintiffs' motion for a Rule 7 appeal bond is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly , Plaintiffs' "Request for Order Summarily Granting Motion for Rule 7 Appeal Bond" is DENIED AS MOOT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7, objectors Omar Rivero and Stephanie Berg must jointly and severally post an appeal bond in the amount of $3,000 to cover Plaintiffs' costs on appeal. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/10/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). (akr)
April 5, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (1) Final Approval to Class Action Settlement; (2) Award of Attorney's Fees; and (3) Judgment of Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 23(e)(2), the Court finds after a hearing and based upon all submissio ns of the Parties and Interested Persons, the Settlement proposed by the Parties is fair, reasonable, and adequate. The Settlement is given final approval as a full and final resolution of all claims alleged in the above-titled action. The Court re tains jurisdiction over the administration and effectuation of the Settlement including, but not limited to, the ultimate disbursal to Claimants and payment of Attorneys Fees and Costs; and any other issues related to the Settlement and this Order. The above-titled action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/5/2011. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v Kellogg Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Dennis
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?