Aguilar, et. al. v. Cabrillo Mortgage, et. al.

Plaintiff: Ismael Aguilar and Maria Dolores Hernandez
Defendant: Cabrillo Mortgage, GMAC Mortgage, SBMC Mortgage, ETS Services, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01799
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing's 13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted. The seventh cause of action against Dft Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc is dismissed w/ prejudice. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/11/2010. (Dft Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc terminated) (jah)
February 3, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Select Portfolio's 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting Plaintiffs' 8 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Court orders Plaintiffs' to file second amended complaint w/in 20 days of the filing of this Order. Court grants Dft Select Portfolio's motion to dismiss and dismisses w/ leave to amend the proposed fourth cause of action for accounting against Dft Select Portfolio. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/3/2010. (jah)(jrl).
December 9, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendant's 4 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). The 12/21/2009 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/9/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar, et. al. v. Cabrillo Mortgage, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Aguilar
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Dolores Hernandez
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrillo Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBMC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETS Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?