Williams v. Scribd, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Larry Williams
Defendant: Scribd, Inc., GalaxiaMia, DOE 2, DOE 3, DOE 4, DOE 5, DOE 6, DOE 7, DOE 8, DOE 9 and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01836
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2010 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Joint Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice; each side shall bear its own fees and costs; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/2/10. (kaj) (av1).
October 29, 2010 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: The parties filed dismissal papers. Accordingly, the Settlement Disposition Conference is VACATED.(asz)
October 29, 2010 28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Scribd, Inc. by Larry Williams. (Hallock, Kurt) (kaj).
September 30, 2010 27 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference; the Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference on 9/30/10; a Joint Motion for Dismissal must be electronically filed on or before 10/29/10; Settlement Disposition Conference set for 11/1/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal; Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/30/10.(kaj)(jrl).
September 30, 2010 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/30/2010. The case settled. Order scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Kurt Hallock). (Defendant Attorney Richard Sybert, Yuo-Fong Amato). (alg)
July 26, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 ex parte motion to continue early neutral evaluation conference and for insurance representative to appear telephonically; the early neutral evaluation conference is continued to 9/30/10 at 9:00am before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal; parties shall submit their confidential ENE statements no later than 9/23/10; additionally, the Court finds good cause to grant Defendants ex parte motion for its insurance carriers representative to appear telephonically at the ENE; Scribds insurance carriers representative shall be available by phone for the duration of the ENE; Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/26/10. (kaj) (jrl).
July 26, 2010 24 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Scribd, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (also e-mailed))(Sybert, Richard) qc mail sent re proposed orders (kaj).
July 9, 2010 23 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/4/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/9/10.(kaj) (jrl).
July 8, 2010 22 ANSWER with jury demand to 9 Amended Complaint , by Scribd, Inc.(Sybert, Richard) modified on 7/9/10 to add jury demand (kaj).
June 23, 2010 21 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 06/23/2010. (ag)(jrl).
May 13, 2010 20 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER: Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 09cv1836-LAB(BGS). Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 5/13/10.(mam)
March 2, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER Denying 17 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Response to Surreply. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/26/10. (pdc) (jrl).
February 25, 2010 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to 17 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File, filed by Larry Williams. (Hallock, Kurt) (pdc).
February 23, 2010 17 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Surreply to Motion to Dismiss by Scribd, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Sybert, Richard) Atty contacted re proposed order (pdc).
February 22, 2010 16 SUR-REPLY re 13 Reply, 14 Order, filed by Larry Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Hallock, Kurt) (pdc).
February 17, 2010 15 Minute Entry: Currently on calendar for Monday, February 22, 2010 at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is taken off calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances will be required on February 22, 2010.(pdc) (jrl).
February 13, 2010 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scribd, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Amato, Yuo-Fong) document exceeds page limit; emailed Attny re wrong s/signature (lao).
February 12, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint: Defendant Scribd may either withdraw the 6 motion to dismiss and obtain a new hearing date for a new motion to dismiss, or else explain in its reply brief why the amended complaint doesn't survive the motion to dismiss on file. If Scribd opts for the latter option, Plaintiff will be allowed a sur-reply to explain why his amended complaint should not be dismissed, and that will be due on 2/22/10. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/12/10.(mkz) (jrl).
February 10, 2010 12 RESPONSE to 11 Order to Show Cause, Re: Request for Leave to File FAC filed by Larry Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Hallock, Kurt) (pdc).
February 8, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER to Show Cause: Williams is ordered to obtain the consent of Scribd to amend his complaint, or else persuade the Court that leave to amend should be granted. He must do so within two days of the date this order is entered. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/5/10.(pdc) (jrl).
February 8, 2010 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to 6 Motion to Dismiss Original Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b) filed by Larry Williams. (Hallock, Kurt) (pdc).
February 5, 2010 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Larry Willaims against DOES, GalaxiaMia, Scribd, Inc., Srikanthbnm, alukmanto, api_user_11797, api_user_11797_NEBOJSAJE, api_user_11797_Sathis, api_user_11797_ingrid, api_user_11797_tevado, mikaj, filed by Larry Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proof of Service)(Hallock, Kurt) (pdc).
December 3, 2009 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Yuo-Fong C. Amato on behalf of Scribd, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Amato, Yuo-Fong) (pdc).
November 30, 2009 7 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re 6 MOTION to Dismiss (pdc)
November 30, 2009 6 MOTION to Dismiss, by Scribd, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Yuo-Fong Amato, # 2 Declaration of George Consagra) NUNC PRO TUNC to 11/23/09(pdc) Modified to correct attachment 1 title (pdc).
November 30, 2009 5 Notice of Document Discrepancy Accepting Document: Motion to Dismiss; Declarations from Scribd, Inc. Non-compliance with Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received. (pdc)
November 24, 2009 4 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re 3 (pdc)
November 24, 2009 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Scribd, Inc. waiver sent on 9/22/2009, answer due 11/23/2009. (pdc)
August 25, 2009 2 Summons Issued (pdc)
August 25, 2009 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOE 7, DOE 8, DOE 9, DOES, Scribd, Inc., GalaxiaMia, DOE 2, DOE 3, DOE 4, DOE 5, and DOE 6 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number CAS4546.), filed by Larry Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Copyright Letter) Letter mailed(jer) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Scribd, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Williams
Represented By: Kurt W. Hallock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scribd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GalaxiaMia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?