Ledesma et al v. FCM Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Mario Ledesma, Ruth Ledesma and Laura Flores
Defendant: FCM Corporation, Wilmington Finance, Wilshire Credit Corp. and T.D. Service Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv01837
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Wilshire Credit Corporation's 86 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' RESPA Claim. There are no remaining claims against Wilshire Credit Corporation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/27/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)(jrd)
March 3, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendant Wilshire Credit Corporation's motion to dismiss with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/3/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
January 7, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendant Wilmingtion Finance, Inc,'s ex parte motion in support of Joy Harmon Sterling's pro hac vice application. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/7/2010. (tkl)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledesma et al v. FCM Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Ledesma
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ledesma
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Flores
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilshire Credit Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?