Chan v. Chancelor
Plaintiff: Fred Calara, Pieterke H Beckner, Eugene Harnett, Deryck Pham, Ausim Khan, Robert Dunham, Mina Y Hsing, Michael Hipp, Peter Yang, Gary L Beckner, Mariko Kobayashi, Alvernist Hoskins, Craig A Chan, Danuta A Urbikas, Michaeleon Huynh, Vivien Wong, Nirma Usher, Gil T Buenaventura, Fiona Chin, Betty Andrews, Jean Hernandez, Daniel Hogan, Cerine Paul, Christopher Allred, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Christine Knowlton, John J Urbikas, Mayer Gershkovich, Jonathon Glaubach, James Wolosin, Gilbert Gonzalez, John Allred, Leo R Boese, David McCrerey, Hanna Pham, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mary Hawver, Diane Hogan, Joseph Lee, Alan Anderson, Barbara A Boese, Randall Benton, Kimball Wong, Michael Trainor, Russell Andrews, Stephen Fairley, Mary Allred, Trinh K Nguyen, Lynn Brown, Ezekiel Tsado, Robert C Kuhl, Cheryl Benton, Alexander Oraevsky, Bonnie Feingold, Darin E Krug, Becky Glass, Ruth Fairley, Xuan Thieu Phong, Liem Bui, Phuong Nguyen, Amy Glass, Joyce McCrerey, David Truong, Aubrey Venable, John Anderson, Blessing S Krug, Ryan Rauch, Susan Hipp, Monica Becica, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs and Sylvia Cruz
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Chase Home Finance LLC, Washington Mutual Bank, Christopher Chancelor, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1, Grand Reserve, LLC, James W Chancelor, Marc Corey Chancelor, Waldenpacific Asset Management, LLC, Equilease Residential Services, LLC, Dragon Property Investments, Inc doing business as Beach Hill Development, LLC, The Tassi Group, Inc., Michael Puderbeutel, Does 1 through 200, The Belmont at Ryals Chase Condominium Association, Inc, U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1, America's Servicing Company, Joseph A Tassi, Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2, Orlando GR Apartments. Inc., Abba Real Estate Development Group, LLC doing business as Abba Group, Waldenpacific Exit Strategies, LLC, Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, LaSalle Bank NA, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC, Jewyll S Duncan-Dumornay, Citimortgage, Inc, Robert W Forloine, U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, UBS AG, Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver, Waldenpacific Asset Management, The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Associations, Inc, Northwest Mutual Credit Corporation, Homeq Servicing Corporation, Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC, Chris Drebes, Waldenpacific Financial Services, LLC, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Belmont at Ryals Chase Tampa, LLC, Marlon D Chancelor, SunTrust Banks, Inc., The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, Inc., Orando GR Apartments, Inc., Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC, Waldenpacific Property Trust, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC, Real Time Resolutions, Inc, Bank of America Corporation, Abbey Berkowitz, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Chase Home Finance, LLC, WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC, Citibank, N.A. as Successor Trustee to US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2007-HF1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificiates, Series 2007-HF1, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Beach Hill Development, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., Bank Of America, The Closing Specialists, Inc, Waldenpacific Holdings, LLC and The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv01839
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2013 Filing 418 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Mina Y Hsing . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael)(yeb).
October 8, 2013 Filing 417 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Amy Glass, Becky Glass . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (yeb).
October 8, 2013 Filing 416 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ruth Fairley . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (yeb).
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #414 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs. Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs due 5/20/13. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/3/13. (cge)
May 1, 2013 Filing 414 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and Cost Bill by Bank Of America, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2. (Edoziem, Ofunne)(yeb).
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting #412 Joint Motion to Further Extend Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Cost Bill. Defendants shall have up to and including 04/30/2013, to file a motion for attorneys fees and a bill of costs. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 03/29/2013. (ag) (jrl).
March 29, 2013 Filing 412 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and Cost Bill by Bank Of America, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2. (Edoziem, Ofunne) (yeb).
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting #410 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and a Bill of Costs. Defendants shall have up to and including April 1, 2013, to separately file a motion for attorneys fees and a bill of costs. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 03/05/2013. (yeb)
March 1, 2013 Filing 410 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and Cost Bill by Bank Of America, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2. (Edoziem, Ofunne) (ag).
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting #408 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs. Defendant SunTrust may separately file a motion for attorneys fees and a motion for costs on or before March 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 02/28/2013. (yeb)
February 26, 2013 Filing 408 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Troutman, Eric) (yeb).
February 14, 2013 Filing 407 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The motions to dismiss [Doc. Nos. 373, 378, 382] are granted. Claims 1 and 2 are dismissed with prejudice, and Claims 3-10 are dismissed without prejudice to filing in the appropriate state court(s). This action is closed.(yeb)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER granting #373 Motion to Dismiss; granting #378 Motion to Dismiss; granting #382 Motion to Dismiss. The motions to dismiss [Doc. Nos. #373 , #378 , #382 ] are GRANTED. Claims 1 and 2 are dismissed with prejudice, and Claims 3-10 are dismissed without prejudice to filing in the appropriate state court(s). This action is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 02/13/2013. (yeb)
November 9, 2012 Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by Ofunne Edoziem on behalf of Bank Of America, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust (Edoziem, Ofunne) (yeb).
October 4, 2012 Filing 404 NOTICE by Ausim Khan Withdrawal of Lis Pendens. (Alfred, Michael) (mdc)
June 29, 2012 Filing 403 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Of America, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust re #402 Notice of Appearance, of Helen A. Chang (Chang, Helen)(yeb).
June 28, 2012 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Ann Chang on behalf of Bank Of America, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust (Chang, Helen)(yeb). QC Mailers sent for no proof of service.
June 28, 2012 Filing 401 AMENDED WITHDRAWAL NOTICE of Withdrawal re #4 Notice of Lis Pendens by Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael)(yeb). QC Mailer sent for wrong event used.
June 28, 2012 Filing 400 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Acknowledgment of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens by Leo R Boese (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael)(yeb). QC Mailer sent for wrong event used and duplicate entry.
June 28, 2012 Filing 399 NOTICE of Withdrawal of NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Leo R Boese (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael)(yeb). QC Mailer sent for wrong event used.
June 26, 2012 Filing 398 MINUTE ORDER: The Court finds these matters suitable for submission without oral argument pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the hearings on the motions are VACATED. Motions Submitted #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, #378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (yeb)(jrd)
June 22, 2012 Filing 397 REPLY to Response to Motion re #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bustarde, Darwin)(yeb).
June 22, 2012 Filing 396 MINUTE ORDER: Motions Submitted #382 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. The Court finds this matter suitable for submission without oral argument pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the hearing on the motion is VACATED.(yeb)(jrd)
June 22, 2012 Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by Darwin Lee Bustarde on behalf of Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bustarde, Darwin)(yeb).
June 22, 2012 Filing 394 REPLY to Response to Motion re #382 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint LENDER/SERVICER DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(3) AND 12(B)(6) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(E) filed by Homeq Servicing Corporation. (Corbridge, Brandon)(yeb).
June 22, 2012 Filing 393 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc. RE: Docket Entries 392 & 392-1. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle)(yeb).
June 22, 2012 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Gayle J Mayfield-Venieris on behalf of Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle)(yeb).
June 22, 2012 Filing 391 REPLY to Response to Motion re #378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with proof of service filed by The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc. (Haughey, Charles)(yeb).
June 14, 2012 Filing 390 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig A Chan (Alfred, Michael) (knb).
June 14, 2012 Filing 389 RESPONSE in Opposition re #382 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael) (ag).
June 14, 2012 Filing 388 RESPONSE in Opposition re #382 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael) (ag).
June 14, 2012 Filing 387 RESPONSE in Opposition re #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael)(aef) No certificate of Service.
April 11, 2012 Filing 386 NOTICE by Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton re #4 Notice of Lis Pendens withdrawal (Alfred, Michael) (lmt).
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 385 TRANSFER ORDER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable William McCurine, Jr. to the calendar of the Honorable Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. All future conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge McCurine, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Crawford. Any dates set before the district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 09cv1839-CAB-KSC. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 3/19/12.(ecs)(jrd)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 384 TRANSFER ORDER: Judge Anthony J. Battaglia is no longer assigned to the case and Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is now assigned for all further proceedings. All conferences or hearing dates now set before Judge Battaglia are now set before Judge Bencivengo until further order from Judge Bencivengo. Any dates set before any magistrate judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 09cv1839-CAB-WMC. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/6/12.(ecs)(jrd)
February 17, 2012 Filing 383 NOTICE of Change in Counsel by SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. (Torkamani, Amir) (cge).
February 16, 2012 Filing 382 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by America's Servicing Company, Aurora Loan Services, Inc., Bank Of America, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Citibank, N.A. as Successor Trustee to US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2007-HF1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificiates, Series 2007-HF1, Citimortgage, Inc, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver, JPMorgan Chase Bank, SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., UBS AG, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO, #2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO)(Torkamani, Amir) (ecs).
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 381 TRANSFER ORDER: Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned to the case and Judge William McCurine, Jr. is now assigned for all further proceedings. All ENE, MSC or other settlement conferences, and all scheduling and discovery hearings set before Judge Bencivengo, if any, are Vacated. Counsel will contact the Chambers of Judge William McCurine, Jr., to reschedule any such conferences or hearings within five days of the entry of this order. All other dates, and any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 09cv1839 AJB (WMc). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/13/2012.(mtb)(jrd)
January 31, 2012 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Anthony Tonel on behalf of Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust (Tonel, Wesley) (cge).
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER Granting Defendants Chase Home Finance LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. #374 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Chase has until and including February 16, 2012 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. In addition, the Court grants the same time extension to the remaining lender Defendants: Citimortgage, Inc.; Aurora Loan Services LLC; SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.; Barclays Capital Real Estate Inc. (sued as HomEq Serving Corp.); Wells Fargo Bank; UBS AG; and Bank of America. For purposes of judicial economy and efficiency, the Court directs all of these Defendants to confer with one another regarding the creation of a single consolidated motion to dismiss the SAC, to be filed by February 16, 2012. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/24/12. (kaj)
January 20, 2012 Filing 378 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Haughey, Charles)(cge).
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting #376 Joint Motion re Defendant The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Defendant's response to the Second Amended Complaint due 1/31/12. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/19/12. (cge)(jrd)
January 12, 2012 Filing 376 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc. (Haughey, Charles) (cge).
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Judge Battaglia, Set oppositions as to #373 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Oppositions due by 3/2/2012, Replies due by 3/23/2012, no sur-replies will be filed. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(sc)
January 11, 2012 Filing 374 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #368 Amended Complaint by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
January 11, 2012 Filing 373 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Bustarde, Melissa)(cge).
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #370 , #371 Joint Motions Regarding Defendants' Time to Response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Defendants UBS, Wells Fargo, Citimortgage, Inc.; Aurora Loan Services LLC; SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.; Barclays Capital Real EstateInc.; Chase Home Finance LLC; and Bank of America response to Second Amended Complaint due February 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/10/12. (cge)(jrd)
January 9, 2012 Filing 371 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #368 Amended Complaint by America's Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bliss, Erik) (cge).
January 6, 2012 Filing 370 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #368 Amended Complaint by UBS AG. (Hofeldt, Tiffany) (cge).
December 27, 2011 Filing 369 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang re #368 Amended Complaint(Alfred, Michael) Notified atty regarding case # on cover sheet (ecs).
December 27, 2011 Filing 368 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit) (Alfred, Michael) Notified atty regarding case # on cover sheet (ecs).
December 9, 2011 Filing 367 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin Donald Balser (Balser, Justin) (ATTY MAINT) (cge).
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #216 , #217 , #218 , #222 , #225 , #227 , #228 , #236 Motions to Dismiss. The Court grants leave to amend all applicable claims except the fourth, twelfth, and thirteenth causes of action, which are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs have thirty (30) days to submit an amended Complaint correcting the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so will result in the Courts dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/28/11. (cge)(jrd)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting (1) #220 Motion to Strike Request for Punitive Damages and (2) #219 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens Filed by Defendant Aurora Loan Services LLC. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/28/11. (cge)(jrd)
November 14, 2011 Filing 364 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Gary L Beckner re #4 Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Craig A Chan (withdrawal of Lis Pendens). (Alfred, Michael) (cge).
November 4, 2011 Filing 363 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens by Eugene Harnett (Alfred, Michael) (cge).
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #352 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/07/11. (cge)(jrd)
October 7, 2011 Filing 361 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2011 re #352 MOTION for Default Judgment. No parties appearing. Court Denies #352 Motion for Default Judgment and will issue a written order. (Court Reporter Jeannette Hill).(Plaintiff Attorney N/A). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (smy)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting #358 Joint Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff David Truong. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/26/11. (cge)(jrd)
September 27, 2011 Filing 359 AMENDED NOTICE of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens by Lynn Brown, Alvernist Hoskins (Alfred, Michael) Modified text to remove all caps on 9/28/2011 (cge).
September 21, 2011 Filing 358 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice defendant Citimortgage, Inc. as to Plaintiff David Truong only by David Truong. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #356 Joint Motion to Dismiss defendant Citimortgage, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 09/14/11. (cge)(jrd)
September 8, 2011 Filing 356 JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS defendant Citimortgage, Inc. with prejudice as to Planitiffs Hanna Pham and Michaeleon Huynh only by Michaeleon Huynh, Hanna Pham (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) Modified text to correct event, remove all caps, QC mailer sent to atty on 9/12/2011 (cge).
August 31, 2011 Filing 355 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
July 27, 2011 Filing 354 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
July 27, 2011 Filing 353 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
July 22, 2011 Filing 352 MOTION for Default Judgment against Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC; Orlando GR Apartments, Inc.; Madison at Metrowest Orland, LLC; Equilease Residential Services, LLC; Beach Hill Development LLC; Christopher Chancelor; James W. Chancelor; Marc Corey Chancelor; Robert W. Forloine; The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc.; The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Association; Michael Puderbeutel; WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC; WaldenPacific Financial Services, LLC; WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC; WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC; WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC; WaldenPacific Asset Management, LLC; WaldenPacific Property Trust; WaldenPacific Exit Strategies, LLC; Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit A to Memo of P & A)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
July 13, 2011 Filing 351 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
June 22, 2011 Filing 350 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Acknowledgment of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) Modified text on 6/23/2011 (cge).
May 11, 2011 Filing 349 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
May 11, 2011 Filing 348 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
May 11, 2011 Filing 347 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (cge).
April 27, 2011 Filing 346 NOTICE of Change of Address by David M. Chute (Chute, David) (cge).
April 26, 2011 Filing 345 DOCUMENT E-FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Change of Address by David M. Chute (Chute, David) (cge). Incorrect pdf image. (cge).
April 5, 2011 Filing 344 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Acknowledgment of Lis Pendens by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) Modified text on 4/6/2011 (cge).
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER IN RE CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE ANTHONY J. BATTAGLIA: Judge Anthony J. Battaglia added to the case. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned to case and Judge Anthony J. Battaglia is now assigned to the case. All pending motion hearing and pretrial conference dates on the calendar of Judge Houston shall remain as scheduled on the calendar of Judge Battaglia. All dates calendared before the magistrate judges shall remain as scheduled. The new case number is 09CV1839-AJB(CAB). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 03/25/11.(jpp)(jrd).
February 7, 2011 Filing 342 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
January 25, 2011 Filing 341 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE ORDER - Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 09cv1839-JAH(CAB).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 01/20/11.(jpp) Modified on 1/21/2011 to correct new case #, nef resent to all ptys. (jpp).
January 20, 2011 Filing 338 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC.; Grand Reserve, LLC.; Orlando GR Apartments. Inc. (jpp)
January 19, 2011 Filing 337 Ex Parte MOTION for Entry of Default against Cross-Defendant Grand Reserve, LLC by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service by EFile)(Bustarde, Melissa) (jpp).
January 19, 2011 Filing 336 Ex Parte MOTION for Entry of Default against Cross-Defendant Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service by EFile)(Bustarde, Melissa) (jpp).
January 19, 2011 Filing 335 Ex Parte MOTION for Entry of Default against Cross-Defendant Orlando GR Apartments, Inc. by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service by EFile)(Bustarde, Melissa) (jpp).
January 18, 2011 Filing 339 MINUTE ORDER - Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. The new case number is 09CV1839-JAH(RBB).(jpp) (mam).
January 12, 2011 Filing 334 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
January 11, 2011 Filing 333 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (atty contacted re s/) (lmt).
January 11, 2011 Filing 332 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (srm).
January 11, 2011 Filing 331 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (srm).
January 11, 2011 Filing 330 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jer).
December 13, 2010 Filing 329 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. Orlando GR Apartments. Inc. served on 10/18/2010, answer due 11/8/2010. (Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle) (jpp).
December 13, 2010 Filing 328 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC served on 11/1/2010, answer due 11/22/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle) (jpp).
December 13, 2010 Filing 327 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. Grand Reserve, LLC served on 10/18/2010, answer due 11/8/2010. (Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle) (jpp).
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #324 Joint Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Defendants: U.S. Bancorp; U.S. Bank National Association; U.S. Bank National Association, AS Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1; U.S. Bank National Association, AS Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/07/10. (jpp) (jrl).
December 6, 2010 Filing 325 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party U.S. Bancorp; U.S. Bank National Association; U.S. Bank National Association, AS Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1; U.S. Bank National Association, AS Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1 by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) Modified on 12/7/2010 to reflect efiling is a duplicate of #324 , defendants termed 11/29/10 per #308 . (jpp).
December 6, 2010 Filing 324 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party U.S. Bancorp; U.S. Bank National Association; U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1; U.S. Bank National Assocation, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1 by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) Modified on 12/7/2010 to reflect defendants termed 11/29/10 per #308 (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 323 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 322 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 321 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 320 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 319 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 318 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 317 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 316 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 315 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 314 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 313 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 312 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 311 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 310 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 30, 2010 Filing 309 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang Notice of Withdrawal and Acknowledgement of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. Answer or Other Response to First Amended Complaint deadline set for 10/7/10 as to Defendants U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1, and US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1 - Terminated. Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed 11/29/10. (See #308 .) (mjm)
November 29, 2010 Filing 308 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss Party U.S. Bancorp; U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Assocation, as Trustee for Master Alternativ eLoan Trust 2008-HF1; U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1 by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (lmt).
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER on Joint Stipulation to continue hearing date and related deadlines. The hearing date on #259 U.S. Bank Defendants motion to dismiss and request for judicial notice is continued to 12/20/10 at 2:30pm. The previous hearing date of 11/29/10 is vacated. The previous Stipulation #302 is withdrawn. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/17/10. (jpp) (jrl). Modified on 11/18/2010 to replace image, nef resent to all ptys. (jpp).
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #303 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Defendants: Bank of America Corporation;, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Lasalle Bank NA., and The Bank of New York Mellon. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/17/10. (jpp) (jrl).
November 17, 2010 Filing 305 The parties filed dismissal papers for 10 of the plaintiffs as to defendant Bank of America. Therefore, the court vacates the Settlement Disposition Conference set for 12/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/17/2010. (ecp)
November 16, 2010 Filing 304 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 16, 2010 Filing 303 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bank of America by Gil T Buenaventura, Fiona Chin, Bonnie Feingold, Mary Hawver, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Christine Knowlton, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Alexander Oraevsky, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, Nirma Usher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 15, 2010 Filing 302 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Regarding Defendant US Bancorp's Motiont to Dismiss by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 10, 2010 Filing 301 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Status Conference re 10 plaintiffs and defendant Bank of America held on 11/10/2010. (Plaintiff Attorney Julie Molteni). (Defendant Attorney Jessie Randolph). Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference with these parties only set for 12/15/2010 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes.Plaintiff to arrange conference call. Court will vacate the conference if parties file dismissal papers for the 10 plaintiffs before that time. If parties do not file dismissal papers by that time court will set an in-person hearing. (ecp)
November 8, 2010 Filing 300 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Beach Hill Development, LLC, Christopher Chancelor, James W Chancelor, Marc Corey Chancelor, Equilease Residential Services, LLC, Robert W Forloine, Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC, Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC, Orando GR Apartments, Inc., Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC, Michael Puderbeutel, The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc, The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Associations, Inc, WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC, Waldenpacific Asset Management, LLC, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC, Waldenpacific Exit Strategies, LLC, Waldenpacific Financial Services, LLC, Waldenpacific Property Trust (jpp) (jrl).
November 4, 2010 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang re #289 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC, #294 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Asset Management, LLC, #291 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC, #292 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC, #296 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Exit Strategies, LLC, #297 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC, #293 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Corporate leasing Madison Oaks, LLC, #298 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant James W. Chancelor, #295 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Property Trust, #290 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants WaldenPacific Financial Services, LLC, #287 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Association, #288 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Michael Puderbeutel (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 298 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant James W. Chancelor by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 297 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 296 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Exit Strategies, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 295 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Property Trust by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 294 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Asset Management, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 293 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Corporate leasing Madison Oaks, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 292 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 291 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 290 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants WaldenPacific Financial Services, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 289 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 288 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Michael Puderbeutel by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 287 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Association by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 4, 2010 Filing 286 NOTICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang re #285 Certificate of Service,,,,,,, Notice of Errata to Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 285 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang re #283 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Robert W. Forloine, #277 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Orlando GR Apartments, Inc., #278 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC, #276 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC, #284 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc., #282 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Marc Corey Chancelor, #279 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Equilease Residential Services, LLC, #281 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christopher Chancelor, #280 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Beach Hill Development LLC (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 284 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc. by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 283 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Robert W. Forloine by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 282 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Marc Corey Chancelor by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp)
November 3, 2010 Filing 281 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Christopher Chancelor by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 280 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Beach Hill Development LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 279 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Equilease Residential Services, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 278 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 277 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Orlando GR Apartments, Inc. by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 3, 2010 Filing 276 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2010 Filing 275 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2 of Change of Attorney Information - Jenna Moldawasky no longer counsel for Bank of America Defendants (Randolph, Jesse) (jpp).
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER vacating hearing on Defendants' motions #216 , #217 , #218 , #219 , #220 , #222 , #225 , #227 , #228 , #233 , #236 , set for 10/18/10. Court deems the motions suitable for disposition without oral argument.Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/13/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jrl).
October 13, 2010 Filing 273 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Status Hearing re 10 plaintiffs and defendant Bank of America held on 10/13/2010. (Plaintiff Attorney Julie Molteni). (Defendant Attorney Jessie Randolph). Further telephonic Status Conference with these parties only set for 11/10/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Plaintiff to arrange conference call. Court will vacate that conference if parties file dismissal papers for the 10 plaintiffs before that time. (ecp)
October 11, 2010 Filing 271 REPLY to Response to Motion re #227 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, For More Definite Statement filed by The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc. (Haughey, Charles) (jpp).
October 11, 2010 Filing 270 REPLY - Other re #246 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, #225 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E) In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Homeq Servicing Corporation. (Corbridge, Brandon) (jpp).
October 11, 2010 Filing 269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aurora Loan Services, Inc. re #267 Reply to Response to Motion, #268 Reply to Response to Motion, #266 Reply to Response to Motion (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
October 11, 2010 Filing 268 REPLY to Response to Motion re #220 MOTION to Strike Request for Punitive Damages in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
October 11, 2010 Filing 267 REPLY to Response to Motion re #219 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Balser, Justin) (jpp).
October 11, 2010 Filing 266 REPLY to Response to Motion re #218 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
October 8, 2010 Filing 272 Summons Issued on Crossclaim. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jpp)
October 8, 2010 Filing 265 REPLY - Other re #245 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
October 8, 2010 Filing 264 REPLY - Other re #217 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by America's Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bliss, Erik) (jpp).
October 8, 2010 Filing 263 REPLY to Response to Motion re #236 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by UBS AG. (Hofeldt, Tiffany) (jpp).
October 8, 2010 Filing 262 REPLY to Response to Motion re #222 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint for failure to state a claim, or in the alternative, for a more definite statement filed by SunTrust Banks, Inc., SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Troutman, Eric) (jpp).
October 8, 2010 Filing 261 REPLY to Response to Motion re #233 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Randolph, Jesse) (jpp).
October 7, 2010 Filing 260 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1, US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1. (Zubairi, Faisal) (jpp).
October 7, 2010 Filing 259 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1, US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Faisal Zubairi in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit A), #5 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit B), #6 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit C), #7 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit D), #8 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit E), #9 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit F), #10 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit G), #11 Proof of Service of Motion to Dismiss and Related Documents)(Zubairi, Faisal) (jpp).
October 7, 2010 Filing 258 REPLY - Other re #245 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, #243 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, CitiMortgage's Motion to Dismiss filed by Citimortgage, Inc. (Chute, David) (jpp).
October 6, 2010 Filing 257 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Tassi Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle) (jpp).
October 6, 2010 Filing 256 ANSWER to #214 Amended Complaint,,, by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle) (jpp).
October 6, 2010 Filing 255 CROSSCLAIM against Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC, Grand Reserve, LLC, Orlando GR Apartments. Inc., filed by Joseph A Tassi, The Tassi Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Crossclaim)(Mayfield-Venieris, Gayle) (jpp).
October 5, 2010 Filing 254 NOTICE of Joinder by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2 re #233 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Randolph, Jesse) (jpp).
October 5, 2010 Filing 253 AFFIDAVIT re #251 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #241 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint. The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2 answer due 10/7/2010. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/04/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jrl).
October 4, 2010 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #219 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens, #220 MOTION to Strike Request for Punitive Damages in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #218 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, #4 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Strike, #5 Exhibit Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 4, 2010 Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re #236 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 4, 2010 Filing 249 RESPONSE in Opposition re #216 MOTION to Amend/Correct #214 Amended Complaint,,, MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, motion for a more definite statement under FRCP 12(e) MOTION to Amend/Correct #214 Amended Complaint,,, MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, motion for a more definite statement under FRCP 12(e) filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 4, 2010 Filing 248 RESPONSE in Opposition re #233 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 4, 2010 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint for failure to state a claim, or in the alternative, for a more definite statement filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 4, 2010 Filing 246 RESPONSE in Opposition re #225 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E) filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 4, 2010 Filing 245 RESPONSE in Opposition re #228 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 4, 2010 Filing 244 RESPONSE in Opposition re #217 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 1, 2010 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re #227 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, For More Definite Statement filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
September 28, 2010 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan C Basombrio on behalf of U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1, US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1 (Basombrio, Juan) (jpp).
September 28, 2010 Filing 241 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #214 Amended Complaint,,, to October 7, 2010, by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA, The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Randolph, Jesse) (jpp).
September 27, 2010 Filing 240 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. Orando GR Apartments, Inc. served on 9/15/2010, answer due 10/6/2010; Orlando GR Apartments. Inc. served on 9/15/2010, answer due 10/6/2010. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #238 Stipulation to extend time to respond. U.S. Bank Defendants shall have up to and including 10/7/2010, to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. The hearing date on any motion to dismiss filed by US Bank Defendants shall be set for 11/15/10, or the first available motion hearing date thereafter to which both Plaintiffs' Counsel, Defendant's Counsel and the Court are available. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/24/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jrl).
September 22, 2010 Filing 238 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1, US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1. (Zubairi, Faisal) (jpp).
September 22, 2010 Filing 237 NOTICE by UBS AG Certification of Interested Parties (Hofeldt, Tiffany) (jpp).
September 22, 2010 Filing 236 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by UBS AG. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant UBS AG's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(Hofeldt, Tiffany) (jpp).
September 20, 2010 Filing 235 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2 served on 8/27/2010, answer due 9/17/2010. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
September 20, 2010 Filing 234 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Sylvia Cruz, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Mina Y Hsing, Michaeleon Huynh, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Mariko Kobayashi, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Trinh K Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Deryck Pham, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong, Peter Yang. U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A. served on 9/2/2010, answer due 9/23/2010; U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1 served on 9/2/2010, answer due 9/23/2010; US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1 served on 9/2/2010, answer due 9/23/2010. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
September 15, 2010 Filing 233 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, MOTION for a More Definite Statement by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Randolph, Jesse). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 9/16/2010 (jah). Modified on 9/16/2010 - Multi part motion, one part filed. Email sent to Atty. Added missing motion and judge association. Corrected text (jah).
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #230 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bank of America Corporation answer due 9/15/2010; Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP answer due 9/15/2010; Countrywide Home Loans, Inc answer due 9/15/2010; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company answer due 9/15/2010; LaSalle Bank NA answer due 9/15/2010.. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 09/02/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (jrl).
September 3, 2010 Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Status Hearing re 10 plaintiffs and defendant Bank of America held on 9/3/2010. (Plaintiff Attorney Julie Molteni). (Defendant Attorney Jessie Randolph). Further telephonic Status Conference with these parties only set for 10/13/2010 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Court will vacate that conference if parties file dismissal papers for the 10 plaintiffs before that time. (ecp)
September 1, 2010 Filing 230 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #214 Amended Complaint,,, to September 15, 2010 by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA. (Randolph, Jesse) (jpp).
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER Granting (Doc. #226 ) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chase Home Finance LLC answer due 8/30/2010; Chase Home Finance, LLC answer due 8/30/2010; JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver answer due 8/30/2010; JPMorgan Chase Bank answer due 8/30/2010. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 8/31/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm) (av1).
August 30, 2010 Filing 228 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Chase Home Finance LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver, Washington Mutual Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
August 27, 2010 Filing 227 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, For More Definite Statement by The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc. (Haughey, Charles) (jpp).
August 24, 2010 Filing 226 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #214 Amended Complaint,,, by Chase Home Finance LLC, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
August 23, 2010 Filing 225 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E) by Homeq Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Corbridge, Brandon) (jpp).
August 23, 2010 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA (Randolph, Jesse) (jpp).
August 20, 2010 Filing 223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig A Chan re #214 Amended Complaint,,, (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
August 19, 2010 Filing 222 MOTION to Dismiss amended complaint for failure to state a claim, or in the alternative, for a more definite statement by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Troutman, Eric) (jpp).
August 19, 2010 Filing 221 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aurora Loan Services, Inc. re #219 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens, #220 MOTION to Strike Request for Punitive Damages in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #218 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
August 19, 2010 Filing 220 MOTION to Strike Request for Punitive Damages in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Balser, Justin) (jpp).
August 19, 2010 Filing 219 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Balser, Justin) (jpp).
August 19, 2010 Filing 218 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1-7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 8-11 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 12-15 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Balser, Justin) (jpp).
August 19, 2010 Filing 217 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by America's Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Bliss, Erik) (jpp).
August 19, 2010 Filing 216 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Citimortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Chute, David) (jpp).
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER denying defendants' motions to dismiss #40 #112 #120 #128 #132 without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 08/06/10. (jpp) (jrl).
August 5, 2010 Filing 214 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Cheryl Benton, Randall Benton, Fred Calara, Craig A Chan, Sylvia Cruz, Ruth Fairley, Stephen Fairley, Leib Gershkovich, Mayer Gershkovich, Jonathon Glaubach, Gilbert Gonzalez, Mina Y Hsing, Cindy M Jacobs, Richard G Jacobs, Mariko Kobayashi, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Trinh K Nguyen, Deryck Pham, Danuta A Urbikas, John J Urbikas, Peter Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Appendix Summons on First Amended Complaint, #23 Declaration Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
July 30, 2010 Filing 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Settlement Disposition Conference held on 7/30/2010. (Plaintiff Attorney Julie Molteni). (Defendant Attorney Jenna Moldawsky). Telephonic Status Conference re: settlement with counsel for Plaintiffs and Bank of America set for 9/3/2010 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Plaintiffs' counsel shall arrange conference call. (ecp)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER following motion hearing. The temporary restraining order issued on 07/09/10 shall be allowed to lapse on its terms; and Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction #197 is denied. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 07/23/10.(jpp) (av1).
July 23, 2010 Filing 211 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2010 denying #197 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Craig A Chan. The Court shall issue an order. The temporary restraining order dated July 9, 2010 shall be allowed to lapse. Plaintiff has until 8/6/10 to amend the complaint. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cesena.)(Plaintiff Attorney Michael A. Alfred).(Defendant Attorney Jeff Brethen, Justin Donald Balser, Erik Sean Bliss, David M. Chute, Regina Jill McClendon, Jenna Moldawsky). (lwm)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER resetting Telephonic Status Conference to 7/30/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 07/21/10.(jpp) (jrl).
July 20, 2010 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #156 unopposed Motion for leave to file a First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve their first amended complaint no later than 08/06/10. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 07/20/10. (jpp) (jrl).
July 16, 2010 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SunTrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kim Blankenship, #2 Exhibit A to Blankenship Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Blankenship Decl., #4 Proof of Service)(McClendon, Regina) (jpp).
July 16, 2010 Filing 206 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aurora Loan Services, Inc. re #205 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
July 16, 2010 Filing 205 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Zimmerman, #2 Exhibit A-E to Declaration, #3 Exhibit F-R to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Objections to Evidence)(Balser, Justin) (jpp).
July 16, 2010 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chase Home Finance LLC, Chase Home Finance, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
July 16, 2010 Filing 203 RESPONSE re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Citimortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Chute, David) (jpp).
July 16, 2010 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Objections to Evidence)(Moldawsky, Jenna) (jpp).
July 15, 2010 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by America's Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Bliss, Erik) (jpp).
July 14, 2010 Filing 200 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA of Change of Attorney Information (Moldawsky, Jenna) (jpp).
July 13, 2010 Filing 199 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Craig A Chan re #197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #197 Plaintiffs' ex parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction will be held before this Court on 07/23/10 at 9:00am in Courtroom 11. Opposition due no later than 07/16/10. Plaintiffs' reply to any opposition is due no later than 07/20/10. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 07/09/10. (jpp) (jrl).
July 9, 2010 Filing 197 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Declaration, #14 Declaration, #15 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 7/14/2010 (jpp).
June 18, 2010 Filing 196 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Settlement Disposition Conference held on 6/18/2010. (Plaintiff Attorneys Michael Alfred, Julie Molteni). (Defendant Attorney Jenna Moldawsky). Further telephonic Status Conference with Plaintiff and Bank of America set for 7/23/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange the conference call. (ecp)
May 20, 2010 Filing 195 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, Alan Anderson, John Anderson, Betty Andrews, Russell Andrews, Monica Becica, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Barbara A Boese, Leo R Boese, Lynn Brown, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Craig A Chan, Fiona Chin, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Eugene Harnett, Mary Hawver, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Alvernist Hoskins, Michaeleon Huynh, Ausim Khan, Christine Knowlton, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Hanna Pham, Xuan Thieu Phong, Ryan Rauch, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Vivien Wong. Michael Puderbeutel served on 3/16/2010, answer due 4/6/2010. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
May 14, 2010 Filing 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Settlement Disposition Conference with Plaintiff and Defendant Bank of America held on 5/14/2010. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael Alfred). (Defendant Attorney Jenna Moldawsky). Further telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference with Plaintiff and Bank of America set for 6/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange the conference call. (ecp)
May 6, 2010 Filing 193 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles S Haughey, Jr (Haughey, Charles) (jpp).
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #191 Joint Motion to Continue discovery deadlines. The 04/26/10 deadline to lodge a Joint Discovery Plan, the 04/30/10 deadline for initial disclosures, and the 05/07/10 Case Management Conference are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 04/26/10. (jpp)(jrl).
April 23, 2010 Filing 191 Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines by SunTrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McClendon, Regina) (jpp).
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Of Dismissal - granting #189 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Darin E. and Blessing S. Krug's Claims Against Aurora Loan Services LLC with Prejudice. It is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the claims of the Plaintiffs Darin E. And Blessing S. Krug's Claims against Defendant Aurora Loan Services, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 4/16/2010. (leh) (jrl).
April 16, 2010 Filing 189 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Darin E. and Blessing S. Krug's Claims Against Aurora Loan Services LLC with Prejudice by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
April 9, 2010 Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Settlement Disposition Conference held on 4/9/2010. (Plaintiff Attorney Julie Molteni). (Defendant Attorneys Sean Muntz, Jenna Moldawski). Second telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference set for 5/14/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange the conference call. The court will vacate the conference if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers before that time. (ecp)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER vacating hearing on #156 plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint set for 02/22/10. Court deems motion suitable for disposition without oral argument Complaint. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 02/17/10.(jpp) (mam).
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held 02/03/10. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom G before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 02/05/10.(jpp)(jrl).
February 5, 2010 Filing 185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 2/3/2010. Case did not settle. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Michael Alfred). (Defendant Attorney David Chute, Regina McClendon, Erik Bliss, Charles Haughey, Brandon Corbridge, Justine Balser, Chris Yoo). (ccf)
February 1, 2010 Filing 184 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: In light of the Notice of Settlement on File [Docket No. 183], the settling Defendants and their counsel are excused from attendance at the Mandatory Settlement Conference set for February 3, 2010. The Court will conduct a TELEPHONIC status conference re: dismisssal on April 9, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. The settling Defendants' counsel shall initiate the teleconference. If appropriate dismissal papers are filed prior to the conference, the court will vacate the conference. All other parties and their counsel shall appear at the Mandatory Settlement Conference.. Status Conference set for 4/9/2010 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. (ccf)
January 29, 2010 Filing 183 NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Settlement Disposition Conference by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA (Muntz, Sean) (jpp).
January 26, 2010 Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC re #173 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Re Order Granting Motion (Ryan, Greg) (jpp).
January 25, 2010 Filing 182 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2010 granting #173 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC. (Court Reporter Melinda Setterman). (Plaintiff Attorney n/a). (Defendant Attorney Greg J. Ryan). (lwm)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #173 of Law Offices of Greg J. Ryan, APLC to withdraw as counsel to Defendant Hollywood Penthouse Offices, LLC. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 01/25/10. (jpp) (jrl).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 Ex Parte Application to File Supporting Declaration Under Seal Re: Motion of Law Offices of Greg J. Ryan, APLC to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendant Hollywood Penthouse Offices, LLC. It is hereby ordered that the Declaration in Support of the Motion may be filed under seal and only served upon Defendant Hollywood Penthouse Offices, LLC. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/11/2010. (leh)
January 13, 2010 Filing 177 Ex Parte Application to File Supporting Declaration Under Seal Re: Motion of Law Offices of Greg J. Ryan, APLC to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendant Hollywood Penthouse Offices, LLC by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC. (leh)
January 12, 2010 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC re #174 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time & Specially Set Motion to Withdraw (Ryan, Greg) (jpp).
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #174 Ex parte Motion to Shorten Time and expedite hearing on #173 Defendant's motion to withdraw. The motion to withdraw is rescheduled to be heard before this Court on 01/25/2010 at 2:30pm. Any opposition to the motion shall be filed and served no later than 01/20/10. No reply brief is required. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 01/11/10. (jpp) (jrl).
January 8, 2010 Filing 174 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time & Specially Set Motion to Withdraw by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Ryan, Greg) (jpp).
January 8, 2010 Filing 173 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Ryan, Greg) (jpp).
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER setting Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2010 02:30 PM in Room 1101 before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/4/2010.(tkl) (jrl).
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER following motion hearing. The Court's order to show regarding venue #84 is vacated. The issued of venue will be addressed at a later date, as deemed necessary. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #83 and #84 is denied with prejudice as to plaintiff Dunham's loan service by defendant Aurora Loan Services and denied without prejudice as to the remainder of the loans. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/22/09. (jpp) (jrl).
December 21, 2009 Filing 170 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston:Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2009 denying with prejudice #83 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to Aurora Loan Services and Dunham and denied without prejudice as to the remainder of the loans. Parties shall contact the Magistrate Judge regarding a settlement conference. (Court Reporter Melinda Setterman.)(Plaintiff Attorney Michael A. Alfred).(Defendant Attorney Justin Donald Balser, David M. Chute, Sean D. Muntz, Eric J. Troutman, Brandon Corbridge). (lwm)
December 18, 2009 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Andrew Thompson on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA (Thompson, Douglas) (jpp).
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER vacating hearing set for 12/21/09 on Defendants' motions to dismiss Docs #40 , #112 , #117 , #120 , #128 , #132 . Court deems motions suitable for disposition without oral argument. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/16/09.(jpp) (jrl).
December 16, 2009 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D Vogel on behalf of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Vogel, Edward) (jpp).
December 16, 2009 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D Vogel on behalf of America's Servicing Company (Vogel, Edward) (jpp).
December 14, 2009 Filing 165 REPLY - Other re #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
December 14, 2009 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e) filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Muntz, Sean) (jpp).
December 14, 2009 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Support re #120 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by SunTrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McClendon, Regina) (jpp).
December 14, 2009 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #132 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service)(Balser, Justin) (jpp).
December 11, 2009 Filing 161 REPLY - Other re #157 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, of CitiMortgage, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Citimortgage, Inc. (Chute, David) (jpp).
December 11, 2009 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Support re #122 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suppo MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suppo filed by Homeq Servicing Corporation. (Corbridge, Brandon) (jpp).
December 11, 2009 Filing 159 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Reply In Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by America's Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bliss, Erik) (jpp).
December 11, 2009 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Joseph A Tassi served on 12/8/2009, answer due 12/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
December 7, 2009 Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e), #112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, #132 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages, #117 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #120 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #122 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suppo MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suppo, #128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
December 2, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,, by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Memo of Points and Authorities Points #5 Proof of Service (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER rescheduling hearing date on #83 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and order to show cause hearing regarding venue to 12/21/09 at 2:30pm in Courtroom 11 before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/24/09. (jpp) Modified on 11/25/2009 to correct motion doc# to 83, nef resent to all parties (jpp). (jrl).
November 24, 2009 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S Haughey, Jr on behalf of The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc (Haughey, Charles) (jpp).
November 19, 2009 Filing 153 Evidentiary Objections to Exhibit 6 to Reply Re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Citimortgage, Inc. (Chute, David) Modified to edit text per attorney on 11/19/2009 (vet).
November 19, 2009 Filing 152 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Waldenpacific Exit Strategies, LLC (jpp) (jrl).
November 19, 2009 Filing 151 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert W Forloine (jpp) (jrl).
November 19, 2009 Filing 150 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Marlon D Chancelor (jpp) (jrl).
November 19, 2009 Filing 149 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC (jpp) (jrl).
November 19, 2009 Filing 148 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC (jpp) (jrl).
November 19, 2009 Filing 147 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Waldenpacific Property Trust (jpp) (jrl).
November 18, 2009 Filing 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig A Chan re #141 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #145 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #142 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #143 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #139 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #144 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #140 Request for Entry of Clerks Default (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 18, 2009 Filing 145 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Craig A Chan of Defendant Dragon Property only. (Alfred, Michael) Modified on 11/18/2009 to add pty to txt. (jpp).
November 18, 2009 Filing 144 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 18, 2009 Filing 143 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael)(jpp).
November 18, 2009 Filing 142 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Robert W. Forloine. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 18, 2009 Filing 141 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Property Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 18, 2009 Filing 140 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Marlon D. Chancelor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 18, 2009 Filing 139 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Exit Strategies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 17, 2009 Filing 138 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Marlon D Chancelor served on 10/6/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 17, 2009 Filing 137 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Exit Strategies, LLC served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/26/2008. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 17, 2009 Filing 136 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Associations, Inc served on 10/8/2009, answer due 10/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 17, 2009 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #83 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
November 13, 2009 Filing 134 REPLY - Other re #121 Response in Opposition to Motion, #116 Response to Motion, #125 Response in Opposition to Motion, #124 Response in Opposition to Motion, #126 Response in Opposition to Motion, #119 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
November 10, 2009 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aurora Loan Services, Inc. re #132 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
November 10, 2009 Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens, MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1-7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 8-9 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 10-14 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Balser, Justin)(jpp).
November 10, 2009 Filing 131 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Aurora Loan Services, Inc. re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Expunge Lis Pendens Filed MOTION to Expunge filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc., #130 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Expunge MOTION to Strike filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Balser, Justin) Modified on 11/16/2009 to edit txt. (jpp).
November 9, 2009 Filing 130 WITHDRAWN PER #131 - Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Balser, Justin) Modified on 11/10/2009 to correct motion selected. Emailed atty to file memo of p's and a's and proof of service (ag). Added MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens and MOTION to Strike on 11/10/2009 (ag) Modified on 11/12/2009 to term motion, withdraw per #131 (jpp).
November 9, 2009 Filing 129 WITHDRAWN PER #131 - MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Expunge Lis Pendens Filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit RJN Exhibits 1-6, #4 Exhibit RJN Exhibits 7-9, #5 Exhibit RJN Exhibits 10-14, #6 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #7 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Balser, Justin). Added MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens on 11/10/2009 (lao). Attny called re Multi-part motions and proposed orders; Attny to withdrawal document (lao). Modified on 11/12/2009 to term motion, withdrawn per #131 (jpp).
November 9, 2009 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Support re #102 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aurora Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura McCann, #2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration, #3 Exhibit E-H to Declaration, #4 Exhibit I-J to Declaration, #5 Exhibit K-N to Declaration, #6 Exhibit O-R to Declaration)(Balser, Justin) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #83 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Homeq Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiffs' Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Scott) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Kim Blanenship in Support of Opposition filed by SunTrust Banks, Inc.. (Troutman, Eric) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 123 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Homeq Servicing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Scott) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(E); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Homeq Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Scott) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA. (Muntz, Sean) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 120 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by SunTrust Banks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kim Blankenship, #2 Notice Notice of Party with Financial Interest, #3 Request for Judicial Notice re Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit A-B, #5 Exhibit C-D, #6 Exhibit E)(Troutman, Eric) (jpp).
November 6, 2009 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Suntrust Mortgage. (Troutman, Eric) (jpp).
November 5, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE JOINDER by Defendants America's Servicing Company and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bliss, Erik). Modified on 11/6/2009 to edit txt. (jpp).
November 5, 2009 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by America's Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Bliss, Erik) (jpp).
November 5, 2009 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Citimortgage, Inc. (Chute, David) (jpp).
November 3, 2009 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE of Counsel As to Interested Parties by Sean D Muntz on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA (Muntz, Sean) (jpp).
November 3, 2009 Filing 114 NOTICE of Joinder by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e) (Muntz, Sean) (jpp).
October 27, 2009 Filing 113 Proof of Service re #113 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC. (Ryan, Greg) Modified on 10/27/2009 to term and edit text, efiling not a motion (jpp).
October 26, 2009 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Ryan, Greg) (jpp).
October 22, 2009 Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael)
October 22, 2009 Filing 110 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Craig A Chan re #108 Summons Returned Executed filed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 22, 2009 Filing 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Belmont at Ryals Chase Tampa, LLC served on 9/10/2009, answer due 9/30/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 22, 2009 Filing 108 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Property Trust served on 9/10/2009, answer due 9/30/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 22, 2009 Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC served on 9/10/2009, answer due 9/30/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 21, 2009 Filing 106 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Washington Mutual Bank (jpp) (jrl).
October 21, 2009 Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. LaSalle Bank NA served on 9/15/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 21, 2009 Filing 104 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Robert W Forloine served on 9/16/2009, answer due 10/6/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 19, 2009 Filing 103 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc served on 9/30/2009, answer due 10/20/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 16, 2009 Filing 102 OPPOSITION to #84 Order to Show Cause by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Alfred, Michael). Modified on 10/19/09 to edit txt, efiling not a motion. (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Notice of Document Discrepancy by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: Letters from Marlon D Chancelor. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex Parte Communication is prohibited.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is NOT to be filed, but instead REJECTED and it is ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this order on all parties. Counsel is advised that any further failure to comply with the Local Rules may lead to penalties pursuant to Local Rule 83.1., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/15/09. (jpp)
October 15, 2009 Filing 100 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC (jpp) (jrl).
October 15, 2009 Filing 99 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Grand Reserve, LLC (jpp) (jrl).
October 15, 2009 Filing 98 FILED IN ERROR - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Washington Mutual Bank (jpp) (jrl). Modified on 10/21/2009 to reflect default entered 5 days early, Complaint served 09/30/09, answer due 10/20/09, amended default entered see #106 . (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 97 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Marc Corey Chancelor (jpp) (jrl).
October 15, 2009 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig A Chan re #95 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #94 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #91 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #93 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #92 Request for Entry of Clerks Default (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 95 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 94 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Grand Reserve, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 93 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Washington Mutual Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 92 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Marc Corey Chancelor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Craig A Chan (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 15, 2009 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Donald Balser on behalf of Aurora Loan Services, Inc. (Balser, Justin) (jpp).
October 14, 2009 Filing 88 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motoin, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Motion, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Motion, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Motion, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Motion, #8 Declaration Declaration of Michael A. Alfred, #9 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Notice of Document Discrepancy and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Rejecting Document: (4) Letters from Defendant Marc Corey Chancelor, Original Document was returned to the filer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: : Local Rule 83.9 - Ex Parte Communication prohibited.. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/09/09. (jpp)
October 9, 2009 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Jill McClendon on behalf of SunTrust Banks, Inc. (McClendon, Regina) (jpp).
October 9, 2009 Filing 85 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Washington Mutual Bank served on 9/30/2009, answer due 10/20/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Denying #83 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; Scheduling Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Order to Show Cause Re: Improper Venue. The instant motion is construed as a motion for preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall be heard before this Court on December 4, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs may supplement their motion no later than October 16, 2009. Defendants shall file their oppositions to the preliminary injunction motion no later than November 6, 2009. Plaintiffs shall file their reply no later than November 13, 2009. Plaintiffs shall appear for an Order to Show Cause Hearing on December 4, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. Any opposition to the order to show cause shall be filed no later than October 16, 2009. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/6/09. (cap)(av1).
October 5, 2009 Filing 83 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Craig A Chan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael A. Alfred)(Alfred, Michael) (jpp). Modified on 10/7/2009 to update docket text (cap).
October 2, 2009 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. UBS AG waiver sent on 9/9/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (jpp).
October 1, 2009 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Homeq Servicing Corporation waiver sent on 9/9/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (vet).
October 1, 2009 Filing 80 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to WaldenPacific Financial Services, LLC. (mdc) (jrl).
October 1, 2009 Filing 79 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Waldenpacific Asset Management, LLC (lao) (jrl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company waiver sent on 9/8/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael). (jah).
September 30, 2009 Filing 77 DOCUMENT E-Filed in Error - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2009 to reflect error - no Party selected for service no answer date set; Attny to re-file (lao).
September 30, 2009 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig A Chan (Alfred, Michael) (tkl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 75 Amended Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC. (asw) (jrl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 74 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2009 - Clerk's Default entered. (mdc)
September 30, 2009 Filing 73 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (lao).
September 30, 2009 Filing 72 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael). Clerk's Entry of Default entered 9/30/09. See #70 . Modified on 10/1/2009 (tkl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 71 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2009 - Sent e-mail to atty re missing service document. (mdc)
September 30, 2009 Filing 70 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC. (cap) (jrl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 69 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Equilease Residential Services, LLC. (vet) (jrl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 68 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC. (asw) (jrl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 67 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC (ag) (jrl).
September 30, 2009 Filing 66 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC (pdc) (jrl).
September 29, 2009 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Marc Corey Chancelor served on 9/18/2009, answer due 10/8/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (ag).
September 29, 2009 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc served on 9/21/2009, answer due 10/13/2009. (Alfred, Michael)(asw).
September 29, 2009 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Dragon Property Investments, Inc served on 9/22/2009, answer due 10/13/2009. (Alfred, Michael) Modified on 9/30/2009 - Atty's office to refile. (mdc)
September 29, 2009 Filing 62 WITHDRAWN PER DOC. #71 - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig A Chan re #60 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #59 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #61 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #56 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #57 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #58 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #55 Request for Entry of Clerks Default (Alfred, Michael). Modified on 9/30/2009 (tkl). Emailed atty re S/ on proof of service. Modified on 10/1/2009 to indicate withdrawn status. (mdc)
September 29, 2009 Filing 61 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) Atty contacted re s/ (pdc).
September 29, 2009 Filing 60 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN see entry #71 - Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) Modified text on 09/30/09 to reflect document withdrawn; document missing s/signature (lao).
September 29, 2009 Filing 59 WITHDRAWN PER DOC. #71 - Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael). Modified on 9/30/2009 - Request and Affidavit not signed. No Proof of Service. Email sent to Atty to refile. Clerk's Default not prepared, Request needs to be refiled (jah). Modified on 10/1/2009 to indicate withdrawn status. (mdc)
September 29, 2009 Filing 58 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Equilease Residential Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) Modified on 9/30/2009 - Atty e-mailed re electronic signature. Clerk's Default prepared (vet).
September 29, 2009 Filing 57 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (cap).
September 29, 2009 Filing 56 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (ag).
September 29, 2009 Filing 55 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC. (Attachments: #1Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) Atty notified re s/ (asw).
September 29, 2009 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP waiver sent on 9/9/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (tkl).
September 29, 2009 Filing 53 WITHDRAWN PER DOC. #71 - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP waiver sent on 9/9/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (lao). Modified on 10/1/2009 to indicate withdrawn status. (mdc)
September 29, 2009 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Alfred, Michael). (jah).
September 29, 2009 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust waiver sent on 9/9/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (vet).
September 29, 2009 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Bank of America Corporation waiver sent on 9/4/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (cap).
September 28, 2009 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan as to Aurora Loan Services, Inc. (Summons returned executed on 9/22/2009) (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 28, 2009 Filing 48 Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc (pdc) (kaj).
September 28, 2009 Filing 47 Clerk's Entry of Default as to James W Chancelor (pdc)(kaj).
September 28, 2009 Filing 46 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Christopher Chancelor (pdc)(kaj).
September 25, 2009 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig A Chan re #44 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #43 Request for Entry of Clerks Default, #42 Request for Entry of Clerks Default (Alfred, Michael) (cap).
September 25, 2009 Filing 44 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) Atty contacted re s/ (pdc).
September 25, 2009 Filing 43 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against James W. Chancelor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 25, 2009 Filing 42 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Christopher Chancelor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit )(Alfred, Michael) Atty contacted re s/ (pdc).
September 24, 2009 Filing 41 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, by Citimortgage, Inc (Chute, David) Edited document title. Atty contacted re s/ and incorrect court title (pdc).
September 24, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement under F.R.C.P. 12(e) by Citimortgage, Inc. (Chute, David) Atty contacted re memorandum (pdc).
September 23, 2009 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan, America's Servicing Company. America's Servicing Company waiver sent on 9/9/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (cap).
September 23, 2009 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. (Alfred, Michael) (cap).
September 23, 2009 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Bank of America Corporation served on 9/4/2009, answer due 9/24/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 23, 2009 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) Modified on 9/24/2009 to correct answer served/due date (asw).
September 23, 2009 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc served on 9/4/2009, answer due 9/24/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (asw).
September 23, 2009 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Citimortgage, Inc served on 9/4/2009, answer due 9/24/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (asw).
September 23, 2009 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Real Time Resolutions, Inc served on 9/4/2009, answer due 9/24/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (tkl).
September 23, 2009 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Bank Of America served on 9/4/2009, answer due 9/24/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (tkl).
September 23, 2009 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. JPMorgan Chase Bank served on 9/4/2009, answer due 9/24/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (tkl).
September 23, 2009 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Chase Home Finance LLC served on 9/4/2009, answer due 9/24/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (mdc)
September 23, 2009 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Financial Services, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (mdc)
September 23, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. by Craig A Chan (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Alfred, Michael) Modified on 9/24/2009 - Added deft name to text; termed Deft Real Time Resolutions, Inc. (mdc)
September 22, 2009 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (mjj)
September 22, 2009 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (cap).
September 22, 2009 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Asset Management, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (cap).
September 22, 2009 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (mkz).
September 22, 2009 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Waldenpacific Asset Management served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (mkz).
September 22, 2009 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. UBS AG served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael)(asw).
September 22, 2009 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. SunTrust Banks, Inc. waiver sent on 9/10/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (asw).
September 22, 2009 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. SunTrust Banks, Inc. served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC served on 9/16/2009, answer due 10/6/2009. (Alfred, Michael) Atty contacted re page two illegible (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Northwest Mutual Credit Corporation served on 9/11/2009, answer due 10/1/2009. (Alfred, Michael) Atty contacted re page two illegible (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Homeq Servicing Corporation served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC served on 9/3/2009, answer due 9/23/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Grand Reserve, LLC served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Equilease Residential Services, LLC served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Alfred, Michael) Modified to correct served and answer dates (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc served on 9/3/2009, answer due 9/23/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. James W Chancelor served on 9/3/2009, answer due 9/23/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Christopher Chancelor served on 9/3/2009, answer due 9/23/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A Chan. Aurora Loan Services, Inc. served on 9/9/2009, answer due 9/29/2009. (Alfred, Michael) (pdc).
September 22, 2009 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement)(Ryan, Greg) contacted Attny re s/signature (lao).
August 31, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Craig A Chan (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #2 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #3 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #4 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #5 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #6 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #7 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #8 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #9 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #10 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #11 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #12 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #13 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #14 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #15 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #16 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #17 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #18 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #19 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #20 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #21 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #22 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #23 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #24 Exhibit Notice of Lis Pendens, #25 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #26 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #27 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #28 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #29 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #30 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #31 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #32 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #33 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #34 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #35 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #36 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #37 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #38 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #39 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #40 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #41 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #42 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #43 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #44 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens, #45 Notice Notice of Lis Pendens)(Alfred, Michael)
August 28, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marlon D Chancelor, James W Chancelor, Christopher Chancelor, Joseph A Tassi, Chase Home Finance LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, America's Servicing Company, SunTrust Banks, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Homeq Servicing Corporation, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Citimortgage, Inc, UBS AG, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, LaSalle Bank NA, Bank Of America, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP, Real Time Resolutions, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC, Jewyll S Duncan-Dumornay, Grand Reserve, LLC, Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC, Waldenpacific Exit Strategies, LLC, Belmont at Ryals Chase Tampa, LLC, Waldenpacific Property Trust, Waldenpacific Holdings, LLC, Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC, Equilease Residential Services, LLC, Waldenpacific Asset Management, Waldenpacific Asset Management, LLC, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC, Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC, Waldenpacific Financial Services, LLC, Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC, Northwest Mutual Credit Corporation, Abbey Berkowitz, Abba Real Estate Development Group, LLC, Robert W Forloine, Michael Puderbeutel, Dragon Property Investments, Inc, The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc, The Closing Specialists, Inc, The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc, The Belmont at Ryals Chase Condominium Association, Inc, The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Associations, Inc, Marc Corey Chancelor. (lao)
August 27, 2009 Filing 2 Minute Entry: Judge Marilyn L. Huff recuses herself and orders that a new judge be drawn and assigned. Judge John A. Houston is added to the case. The new case number is 09cv1839 JAH (NLS.)(cap) (jrl).
August 25, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4549.), filed by Christopher Allred, John Allred, Mary Allred, James Wolosin, Kimball Wong, Russell Andrews, Vivien Wong, Betty Andrews, Gary L Beckner, Pieterke H Beckner, Leo R Boese, Craig A Chan, Barbara A Boese, Lynn Brown, Alvernist Hoskins, Gil T Buenaventura, Liem Bui, Xuan Thieu Phong, Fiona Chin, Robert Dunham, Kenneth F Elkern, Jr, Bonnie Feingold, Jorge Garcia, Amy Glass, Becky Glass, Mary Hawver, Christine Knowlton, Eugene Harnett, Jean Hernandez, Michael Hipp, Susan Hipp, Daniel Hogan, Diane Hogan, Ausim Khan, Blessing S Krug, Darin E Krug, Robert C Kuhl, John Anderson, Joseph Lee, David McCrerey, Joyce McCrerey, Phuong Nguyen, Alexander Oraevsky, Cerine Paul, Monica Becica, Hanna Pham, Michaeleon Huynh, Ryan Rauch, Alan Anderson, Michael Trainor, David Truong, Ezekiel Tsado, Nirma Usher, Aubrey Venable. (ATTY MAINT) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits B - D, #2 Exhibits E- H)(ecl) (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan v. Chancelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Chancelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Sean D Muntz
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2008-HF1
Represented By: Juan C Basombrio
Represented By: Faisal M. Zubairi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Reserve, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Chancelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Corey Chancelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilease Residential Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Property Investments, Inc doing business as Beach Hill Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tassi Group, Inc.
Represented By: Darwin Lee Bustarde
Represented By: Gayle J Mayfield-Venieris
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Bustarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Puderbeutel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Belmont at Ryals Chase Condominium Association, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Master Alternative Loan Trust 2007-HF1
Represented By: Juan C Basombrio
Represented By: Faisal M. Zubairi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Erik Sean Bliss
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A Tassi
Represented By: Darwin Lee Bustarde
Represented By: Gayle J Mayfield-Venieris
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Bustarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Reserve Kirkman Orlando, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificate Holers, CWABS, Inc. Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando GR Apartments. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abba Real Estate Development Group, LLC doing business as Abba Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Exit Strategies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison at Metrowest Orlando, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank NA
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Sean D Muntz
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Grand Reserve, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewyll S Duncan-Dumornay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc
Represented By: David M. Chute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Forloine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp dba US Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Juan C Basombrio
Represented By: Faisal M. Zubairi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Sean D Muntz
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Represented By: Tiffany J. Hofeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Penthouse Office, LLC
Represented By: Greg J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N. A. as an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation acting as Receiver
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Asset Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Madison at Metrowest Condominium Associations, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Mutual Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeq Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Brandon Corbridge
Represented By: Scott H Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Realty Advisors of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Drebes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Helen Ann Chang
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Sean D Muntz
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont at Ryals Chase Tampa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon D Chancelor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J Troutman
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Amir A. Torkamani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Closing Connection Title and Escrow, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Sean Bliss
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orando GR Apartments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Property Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Corporate Leasing Madison Oaks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Helen Ann Chang
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Sean D Muntz
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbey Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association, as Successor-by-Merger to LaSalle Bank, NA as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Servcies 2007-OAO Trust
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Helen Ann Chang
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Represented By: Wesley Anthony Tonel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WaldenPacific Platinum, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. as Successor Trustee to US Bank National Association, as Trustee for Master Adjustable Rate Mortgages Trust 2007-HF1, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificiates, Series 2007-HF1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Jesse Elijah Maram Randolph
Represented By: Jenna Moldawsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beach Hill Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J Troutman
Represented By: Amir A. Torkamani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Represented By: Ofunne N. Edoziem
Represented By: Helen Ann Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Closing Specialists, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldenpacific Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Grand Reserve at Kirkman Parke Condominium Association, Inc
Represented By: Charles S Haughey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Calara
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pieterke H Beckner
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Harnett
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deryck Pham
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ausim Khan
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dunham
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mina Y Hsing
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hipp
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Yang
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L Beckner
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariko Kobayashi
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvernist Hoskins
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig A Chan
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danuta A Urbikas
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaeleon Huynh
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivien Wong
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nirma Usher
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gil T Buenaventura
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiona Chin
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Andrews
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Hernandez
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hogan
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cerine Paul
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allred
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth F Elkern, Jr
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Knowlton
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Urbikas
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayer Gershkovich
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Glaubach
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wolosin
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Allred
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo R Boese
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McCrerey
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Pham
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Garcia
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leib Gershkovich
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hawver
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hogan
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Anderson
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Boese
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Benton
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimball Wong
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Trainor
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Andrews
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Fairley
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Allred
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinh K Nguyen
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Brown
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezekiel Tsado
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Kuhl
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Benton
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Oraevsky
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Feingold
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin E Krug
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Glass
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Fairley
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuan Thieu Phong
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liem Bui
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phuong Nguyen
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Glass
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce McCrerey
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Truong
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Venable
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anderson
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blessing S Krug
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Rauch
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hipp
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Becica
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy M Jacobs
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard G Jacobs
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Cruz
Represented By: Michael A Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?