Shannon Carney v. Verizon Wireless Telecom, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shannon Carney
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Telecom, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01854
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 renewed Motion to Compel arbitration and Stay proceedings pending Arbitration. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/9/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 2, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying Defendants' 60 Motion to Compel Arbitration and (2) Granting Defendants' 60 Motion to Stay proceedings. The Court shall administratively close this case pending the ruling in Concepcion. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/2/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
May 13, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/13/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
December 17, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following Status Conference. A telephonic status conference was held on December 17, 2009. Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss on or before December 23, 2009. Plaintiff shall file her opposition to the motion on or before February 1, 2010, and Defendants shall file their reply on or before February 24, 2010. The motion shall be set for hearing on March 12, 2010, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/17/09.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon Carney v. Verizon Wireless Telecom, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Carney
Represented By: Michael David Seplow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Telecom, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Weissmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?