Illinois Tool Works Inc v. MOC Products Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Illinois Tool Works Inc
Defendant: MOC Products Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01887
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 439 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 422 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/2/2014. (jao)(jrd)
August 31, 2012 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 291 Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Brief Willfulness. The deadline for the parties to file their supplemental briefs is unchanged. The page limitations of the briefs are HEREBY EXTENDED by three pages each, to eighteen pages and thirteen pages, respectively. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/31/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)(jrd)
August 17, 2012 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motions In Limine granting in part and denying in part 247 Motion to Exclude; denying 250 Motion to Exclude; granting 251 Motion to Exclude; granting 252 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying without prejudice in part [ 253] Motion to Preclude; deferring ruling on 254 Motion to Preclude; denying in part and deferring ruling in part on 255 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion to Preclude; deferring ruling on 257 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/17/2012. (mtb)
March 16, 2012 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) denying 221 Motion for Leave to File Summary Adjudication Motion for Invalidity of U.S. Patent '638 Pursuant to 35 USC 103 and (2) denying as moot 223 Motion to Strike Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/16/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
March 6, 2012 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting in part and denying in part 162 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement; (2) denying 172 Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication for Invalidity of U.S. Patent '638 Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 102 an d Under the Doctrine of Laches; and (3) granting in part and denying in part 175 Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication for Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. '855 and '629 and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. '629 and No Liability Under the Doctrine of Equitable Estoppel. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/6/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
May 12, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/12/11.(lmt)
October 26, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion For Leave to File First Amended Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims: Defendant shall file an amended answer by 11/19/10. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/26/10. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Tool Works Inc v. MOC Products Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Tool Works Inc
Represented By: Joseph Edward Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOC Products Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?