Ramirez et al v. SCME Mortgage Bankers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cipriano Ramirez and Teresa Ramirez
Defendant: SCME Mortgage Bankers, Inc., Aurora Loans Servicing, LLC, GMAC Mortgage, Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation and Does
Case Number: 3:2009cv01931
Filed: September 3, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Action and Expunging Notice of Lis Pendens. (Doc. 20 ) Aurora Loans Servicing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Expunge lis pendens are Granted. The action is Dismissed With Prejudice as to Defendants Aurora Loan Services, LLC and Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation. The action is Dismissed Without Prejudice as to the remaining Defendants. Plaintiffs' notice of lis pendens is Expunged. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/3/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
November 3, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying (Doc. 22 ) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Rejecting Notice of Withdrawal. Kent Wilson's motion for leave to withdraw from representation is Denied and his notice of withdrawal is Rejected. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/3/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
July 19, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant Aurora Loan Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens: Granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; Denying without prejudice 9 Motion to Expunge; The third, fourth, sixth, seve nth, eighth, ninth, eleventh (only to the extent it is based on HOEPA violation), thirteenth, fourteenth, sixteenth, seventeenth, and eighteenth causes of action are Dismissed with prejudice; The remainder of the complaint is Dismissed with leave to amend. If Plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, they must do so no later than August 2, 2010. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/19/2010. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez et al v. SCME Mortgage Bankers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cipriano Ramirez
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ramirez
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCME Mortgage Bankers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loans Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?