Pauma Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of the Pauma & Yuima Reservation v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Pauma Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of the Pauma & Yuima Reservation
Defendant: State of California, California Gambling Control Commission and Arnold Schwarzenegger
Case Number: 3:2009cv01955
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 193 Plaintiff's Ex Parte MOTION to Compel Discovery. For the reasons provided herein, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/27/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 12, 2012 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 186 Joint Motion for Clarification of Scope of Limited, Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/12/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
August 23, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/23/2011. (Dembin, Mitchell)
July 15, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 58 Ex Parte Application to Supplement Record on Appeal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/14/10. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauma Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of the Pauma & Yuima Reservation v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauma Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of the Pauma & Yuima Reservation
Represented By: Cheryl A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Gambling Control Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?