Marques v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ademar A. Marques
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv01985
Filed: September 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. The Court GRANTS the motion with respect to the abuse-of-process cause of action, and accordingly, DISMISSES it from this case; and DENIES the motion with respect to the slander-of-title cause of action. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/10/2011. (mtb)
May 23, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/23/2011. (mtb)
August 12, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: Defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer based on improper venue is DENIED. Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint he must do so no later than August 31, 2010. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/12/2010. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marques v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ademar A. Marques
Represented By: Octavio Cardona-Loya, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?