Aguilar v. Resmae Mortgage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Vicente Aguilar
Defendant: Resmae Mortgage Corporation, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Wilshire Credit Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02004
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the motion to dismiss is granted.(tkl) (av1).
January 22, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/22/2010. (tkl) (av1).
December 4, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Defendant's motion to dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/4/09. (tkl)(kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. Resmae Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Aguilar
Represented By: Kent C Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resmae Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilshire Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?