Kenneally v. Bank of Nova Scotia et al
Plaintiff: |
John Kenneally |
Defendant: |
Bank of Nova Scotia, Bosa California LLC, Bosa Development California Inc, First American Title Co. and HSBC Bank USA N.A. |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv02039 |
Filed: |
September 18, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Presiding Judge: |
William Q. Hayes |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 26, 2011 |
Filing
70
ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 63 ) Ex Parte Application to Strike, Quash and/or Expunge Attorney Lien is granted. The lien is invalid and unenforceable as it relates to the proceeds of Plaintiff Kenneally's recovery in this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/26/2011. (mdc)
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
67
ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 63 ) Ex Parte Application to Strike, Quash and/or Expunge Attorney Lien will remain pending. No later than fifteen days from the date of this Order, Beck shall respond to the Ex Parte Application to Strike, Quash and/or Expunge Attorney Lien on the merits. Plaintiff may reply no later than fifteen days thereafter. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/22/2011. (mdc)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
54
ORDER: The (Doc. 23 ) Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Bosa California, LLC and Bosa Development California, Inc. is granted in part and denied in part. The claims against Defendants Bosa California, LLC and Bosa Dev elopment California, Inc. in Count IV (unjust enrichment, constructive trust and equitable lien) of the First Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. The (Doc. 24 ) Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Bank of Nova Scotia and HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is granted. All claims against Defendants Bank of Nova Scotia and HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in the First Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. The (Doc. 46 ) Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint f iled by Defendant First American Title Co. is granted. The (Doc. 47 ) Motion to Strike Certain Allegations in the First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant First American Title Co., is denied as moot. All claims against Defendant First American Ti tle Co. in the First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The (Doc. 4 ) Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel is DENIED without prejudice to renew the motion to accurately reflect the claims and parties currently before the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/28/2010. (mdc) (jrl).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?