Kilby v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Plaintiff: Nykeya Kilby
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02051
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2017 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 173 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute (Rule 30(b)(6) Topics). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/26/2017. (ag)
April 19, 2017 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 160 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Disputes (Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories And Document Requests.) It is ordered that the Court finds that plaintiffs request for an order compelling further responses to th ese discovery requests must be granted in part and denied in part. Defendant shall comply with this Order by providing plaintiff with the documents and information as set forth above as soon as possible and on a rolling basis. Defendant must fully comply with this Order no later than 6/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/18/2017. (dxj)
May 31, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. This order disposes of Plaintiff's single PAGA claim. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of CVS and terminate the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/31/2012. (leh)
April 4, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming Tentative Rulings (Doc. 129 ); Denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 83 Motion to Strike. In sum, Plaintiff fails to satisfy the commonality requirement of Rule 23(a) , as well as the predominance and superiority requirements of Rule 23(b)(3). Accordingly, the Court Affirms its tentative ruling and Denies Plaintiff's motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 4/4/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 17, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/16/11. (lmt)
August 23, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, for a More Definite Statement and/or to Strike the First Amended Class Action Complaint: Defendants motion is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/23/2010. (mjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilby v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nykeya Kilby
Represented By: James F Clapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?