Ortiz v. Mortgage It Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Yadira Ortiz
Defendant: Mortgage It Inc., America's Servicing Company, Homefinders Realty and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02103
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's (Doc. 66 ) Request for Dismissal of America's Servicing Company is granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice as to America's Servicing Company. America's Servicing Company's (Doc. 63 ) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is denied as moot. Mortgage It's (Doc. 65 ) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is granted. Mortgage It's (Doc. 64 ) Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is denied as moot. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend within thirty days of the date of this order. In the event no motion is filed, the Court will dismiss the entire action without prejudice and close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/12/2010. (mdc)
May 28, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is granted as to Defendants Mortgage It, Inc. and America's Service Company and denied as to Defendant Homefinders Realty. No later than ten (10) days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff shall file the proposed Second Amended Complaint which is attached to the Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/28/10. (pdc)
March 9, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 24 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mortgage It, Inc. is granted. The (Doc. 23 ) Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Mortgage It, Inc. is denied as moot. The (Doc. 27 ) Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant America's Ser vice Company is granted. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Mortgage It, Inc. and Defendant America's Service Company. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend the complaint within thirty days of the date of this order. In the event no motion is filed, the Court will dismiss the entire action without prejudice and close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/9/2010. (mdc) (jrl).
December 9, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' application for a temporary restraining order (Doc. 28 ) to enjoin America's Service Company from proceeding with an unlawful detainer action in state court to evict Plaintiff is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/9/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Mortgage It Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Ortiz
Represented By: Jesse T. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage It Inc.
Represented By: Janet Maria Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homefinders Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?