Flynn v. Sony Electronics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Flynn
Defendant: Sony Electronics, Inc. and Best Buy Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02109
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2015 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 219 Motion for Approval of Class Notice Proposal. Court denies Plaintiffs' request for approval of notice using case-specific Facebook page. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/7/2015. (jah)
February 26, 2014 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 208 Joint MOTION for Discovery and Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute - Sony Redactions. As stated herein, Plaintiff's motion to compel further production, as presented in the instant joint motion, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 2/26/14. (Dembin, Mitchell)
February 25, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Imposing Sanctions on Plaintiff Ronald Flynn for Failing to Attend Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Setting Further Proceeding. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2011 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/25/2011.(knh)
February 14, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: Counsel for the Defendants are requested to file by February 22, 2011, a declaration detailing the time and fees their respective clients incurred in addressing Flynn's Opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/14/2011.(knh)
October 28, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Best Buy's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 19 Sony's Motion to Dismiss; granting 22 26 Motions for Judicial Notice: Best Buy's motion to dismiss is denied. Sony's Motion to Dismiss is granted as to Plaintiff's seventh claim for relief and denied as to all other claims. If Plaintiff's amend the seventh claim, the amended complaint must be filed by 11/12/10. If Plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint by 11/12/10, Defendants shall file answers to the Consolidated Complaint by 11/22/10. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/27/10. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. Sony Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Flynn
Represented By: William James Doyle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?