Chargers Football Company, LLC et al v. Foley et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Chargers Football Company, LLC and the National Football League Management Council sought to confirm an arbitration award of $416,666.67 against Defendant Steve Foley for being in default of the Signing, Reporting and Playing Bonus clause of his contract. Defendant was placed on Reserve/Non-Football Injury Status and was ineligible to practice and play when he suffered severe injuries to his leg and knee during an altercation with an off-duty police officer.

Plaintiff: Chargers Football Company, LLC and National Football League Management Council
Defendant: Steven Foley and National Football League Players Association
Case Number: 3:2009cv02116
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2010 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered against defendant Steven Foley for $416,666.67, plus interest in accordance with the rate prescribed by Cal. Civ. Code 3289 from the date of the Arbitration Award, May 26, 2009. (jpp)(jpp) (av1).
October 29, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER granting Motion for Default Judgment against defendants Steven Foley and the National Football League Players Association. Judgment is entered against defendant Steven Foley for $416,666.67, plus interest in accordance with the rate prescribed by Cal. Civ. Code 3289 from the date of the Arbitration Award, May 26, 2009. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/25/10.(jpp) (av1).
October 25, 2010 9 NOTICE by Chargers Football Company, LLC Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs (McLaughlin, Gary) (jpp).
October 12, 2010 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Houston: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2010 re 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Default Judgment; MOTION for Default Judgment - Clerk against Steven Foley filed by Chargers Football Company, LLC, National Football League Management Council. Court orders that default judgment shall be entered against Steven Foley, in the amount of $416,666.67. Supplemental briefing re attorney's fees shall be submitted by 10/25/10. Plaintiff to prepare order. (Court Reporter Cameron Kircher).(Plaintiff Attorney Gary M. McLaughlin). (Defendant Attorney n/a). (lwm) Modified on 10/13/2010 (lwm).
August 17, 2010 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees, MOTION for Default Judgment as to, MOTION for Default Judgment - Clerk against Steven Foley by Chargers Football Company, LLC, National Football League Management Council, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Declaration McLaughlin, # 3 Exhibit A Pt. 1 of 3, # 4 Exhibit A Pt. 2 of 3, # 5 Exhibit A Pt. 3 of 3, # 6 Exhibit B)(McLaughlin, Gary) (jpp).
May 19, 2010 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Steven Foley, National Football League Players Association. (jpp) (jrl).
May 18, 2010 5 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Steven Foley and NFL Players Association. (McLaughlin, Gary) (jpp).
January 6, 2010 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chargers Football Company, LLC, National Football League Management Council. Steven Foley served on 12/22/2009, answer due 1/12/2010; National Football League Players Association served on 12/22/2009, answer due 1/12/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(McLaughlin, Gary) (jpp).
September 28, 2009 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Chargers Football Company, LLC, National Football League Management Council (pdc)
September 28, 2009 2 Summons Issued as to Steven Foley, National Football League Players Association. (pdc)
September 28, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Foley, National Football League Players Association ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number CAS005700.), filed by Chargers Football Company, LLC, National Football League Management Council.(knh)(kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chargers Football Company, LLC et al v. Foley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chargers Football Company, LLC
Represented By: Gary M McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Football League Management Council
Represented By: Gary M McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Players Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?