Laguna et al v. Coverall North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sabrina Laguna and ROES
Defendant: Coverall North America, Inc., Allied Capital Corporation and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02131
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2012 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 254 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; granting Plaintiffs' 255 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Class Representative Enchancements. Court retains jurisdiction over the Settlement and any issues that may arise concerning its implementation, enforcement, construction and interpretation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/23/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
July 26, 2011 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 212 Motion for Leave to Serve Limited Arbitration Discovery Prior to Hearing on Motions to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff's request for a 30(b)(6) deposition of the Coverall Defendants is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' request for a 30(b)(6) deposition of Allied/Ares is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs' request for production of the written arbitration agreements for all putative class members is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/26/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
December 10, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Defendant Ted Elliott's ex parte application for order granting 21 day extension of time to file answer, or respond to plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by 12/20/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/10/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
April 2, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant Allied Capital Corporation's Ex Parte Application to Allow Its Corporate Representatives to Appear Telephonically at the April 16, 2010 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 4/2/2010. (tkl)
February 23, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 3/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/23/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (jrl).
January 15, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 3/25/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/15/2010.(tkl) (jrl).
December 18, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/18/09. (lao) (jrl).
September 30, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 joint Motion to Extend Defendant Allied Capital Corporation's time to file answer by 11/3/2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/30/09. (tkl)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laguna et al v. Coverall North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Laguna
Represented By: Raul Cadena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROES
Represented By: Raul Cadena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coverall North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Capital Corporation
Represented By: Mazda K Antia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?