Silva v. Barreras et al

Plaintiff: Jesus Silva
Defendant: Nasaria P Barreras, Khatri, Collinsworth, John Doe and Hatch
Case Number: 3:2009cv02193
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Plaintiff's Appeal Is Not Taken in Good Faith. For these reasons, the Court finds the appeal is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/18/2012. (USCA Case Number 12-55769. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
April 2, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 34 Report and Recommendation, granting 32 Motion to Dismiss, and Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/2/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
March 14, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, Extending Time for Service, and Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff Certified Copy of the In Forma Pauperis/Service Order 8 . Plaintiff shall have an additional 120 days from the date of this order to serve Defendants with the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/14/11. Certified copy of 8 sent to Plaintiff. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(amh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Barreras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nasaria P Barreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khatri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collinsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?