Leon v. Cate

Petitioner: Jose Luis Leon
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Case Number: 3:2009cv02219
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/24/2013. (Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.)(akr)(jrd)
March 11, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 23 Report and Recommendation; and Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. For these reasons stated herein, Leon's Objections to the R&R are Overruled. The R&R is Modified to include the additional discussion stated herein and, so modified, is Adopted. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is Denied. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/8/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
September 9, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 11 Report and Recommendations, Requiring Filing of Verdict Form and Transcript, Requiring Petitioner to Dismiss Unexhausted Claims or Face Dismissal of His Petition; Respondent is ordered to obtain and file a copy of the verdict form , and a copy of the trial court transcript; Respondent must file these no later than Friday, October 8, 2010; Petitioners objections to the R&R are overruled and the Court adopts the R&R as modified; the motion to dismiss is granted in part; the motion to stay and the request for leave to amend the petition are both denied; petitioner shall file an amended complaint no later than 14 calendar days from the date this order is issued; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/8/10. (kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Luis Leon
Represented By: John Owen Lanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?