City of San Diego v. National Steel & Shipbuilding Company et al

Plaintiff: City of San Diego
Defendant: National Steel & Shipbuilding Company, National Steel & Shipbuilding Corporation, National Iron Works, Martinolich Ship Building Company, Southwest Marine, Inc., BAE Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc., San Diego Marine Construction Company, Star and Crescent Boat Company, Star and Crescent Investment Company, Star and Crescent Ferry Company, San Diego Marine Construction Corporation, MCCSD, Campbell Industries, San Diego Gas & Electric, United States Navy, San Diego Unified Port District and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02275
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2015 549 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Confirming Settlement Between BAE Systems San Diego Ship Repair Inc., Southwest Marine, Inc., Star And Crescent Boat Company And The San Diego Unified Port District, And Barring And Dismissing Claims (Re Dkt # 542 ): The Motion is granted, and the Settlement Agreement is approved. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/13/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
April 21, 2015 499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The good faith settlement motion (Doc. 487 ) is granted as follows: (1) The Court finds the Settlement Agreement was entered into in good faith, and is fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purposes of CERCLA and the UCFA. (2) The Moving Parties shall file the revised proposed bar order within ten (10) days from the date this Order is filed. Any objections shall be filed within ten (10) days from the date the proposed bar order is filed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/21/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
November 25, 2014 479 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Confirming Good Faith Settlement Between San Diego Gas & Electric Company and BAE Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc. and Barring and Dismissing Claims. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/25/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
July 10, 2014 423 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The good faith settlement motions (Docs. 354 , 366 , 367 , 368 , 370 ) are granted as follows: 1. The Court finds the Settlement Agreements were entered into in good faith, and are fair, reasonable, and consistent with the purposes of CER CLA and the UCFA. 2. The Moving Parties shall prepare proposed orders that are consistent with this Order and file them on the docket within ten (10) days from the date this Order is filed. Any objections shall be filed within ten (10) days from the date(s) the proposed orders are filed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/10/2014. (mdc)
November 7, 2013 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Objections to the Case Management Conference Order Regulating Phase I(b) and Phase II Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Doc. 292 ) filed by Plaintiff City of San Diego are sustained. The Case Management Conference Order Regulating Phase I(b) and Phase II Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Doc. 290 ), and the Amended Case Management Conference Order (Doc. 361 ) are vacated. The Magistrate Judge shall issue a second amended case management conference order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/7/2013. (mdc)
July 27, 2012 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: SDG&E's Motion for Leave to File the First Amended and Supplemental Cross-Claims (Doc. 204 ) is GRANTED. SDG&E shall file the First Amended and Supplemental Cross-Claims attached to the Motion (Doc. 204 -1 at 9-28) within ten days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/27/2012. (mdc)
October 27, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/27/11. (cge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of San Diego v. National Steel & Shipbuilding Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Diego
Represented By: Brian M. Ledger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel & Shipbuilding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Steel & Shipbuilding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Iron Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinolich Ship Building Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Marine Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star and Crescent Boat Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star and Crescent Investment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star and Crescent Ferry Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Marine Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCSD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Gas & Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified Port District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?