Vissuet v. IndyMac Mortgage Services et al

Plaintiff: Frida Vissuet
Defendant: IndyMac Mortgage Services, Quality Loan Service Corp. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02321
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 43 Motion to File a Supplemental Amended Complaint. Court construes Pla's motion to file a supplemental amended complaint as a Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and grants Pla's motion. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/14/2010. (jah)
June 29, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss; the Court grants the motion to dismiss as it relates to Plaintiffs first cause of action for predatory lending and dismisses with prejudice this cause of action with respect to OneWest. In all other respects, the Court denies the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/29/10. (kaj)
March 19, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part OneWest's 16 Motion to Dismiss. OneWest's motion to dismiss Pla's 1st and 3rd causes of action is granted, those causes of action are dismissed w/ leave to amend. Pla shall have 20 days from the file date of this Order to file a Second Amended Complaint. OneWest's motion to dismiss Pla's 4th cause of action and 5th cause of action seeking injunctive relief is granted and those causes of action are dismissed w/ prejudice. OneWest's motion to dismiss is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/19/2010. (jah) Modified on 3/22/2010 - Corrected text. Regenerated NEF (jah). (jrl).
December 8, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Defendant's 4 Motion to Dismiss. Court will allow Pla to file First Amended Complaint as a matter of course. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/8/2009. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vissuet v. IndyMac Mortgage Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frida Vissuet
Represented By: Ruben Fernando Arizmendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Mortgage Services
Represented By: David C Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?