Hammes Company Healthcare, LLC et al v. Tri-City Healthcare District et al

Plaintiff: Hammes Company Healthcare, LLC and HC Tri-City I, LLC
Defendant: Tri-City Healthcare District, Larry Anderson, Pamela Smith and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02324
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 204 Tri-City Healthcare District's Motion for Attorney Fees. Within seven (7) calendar days of the parties' concluding their settlement efforts, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/6/2014. (srm)
January 10, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Entry of Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/10/2014.(srm)
January 8, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Following Bench Trial. The Court finds in favor of the District. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Tri-City Healthcare District and against Hammes Company Healthcare, LLC on Hammes Healthcare Company, LLC's claim for breach of contract (Letter of Intent). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/8/2014. (srm)
December 21, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Dismissing Claims For Declaratory Relief; (2) Terminating 09-cv-2334; (3) Denying Motion To Dismiss As Moot; (4) Setting Pretrial Conference: A final pretrial conference in the 2324 case will be held on 2/1/2013, at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/21/2012. (mdc)
December 13, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) denying 89 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration ; (2) denying Plaintiffs' 91 Motion for restraining order, injunction, or transfer, and sanctions ; (3) denying 92 Hammes' Motion for Summary Judgment of the First Claim ; and denying 106 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Larry Anderson: The Court STRIKES lines 20-26 on page 17 of its 7/11/11 106 Order. Following entry of this Order, Tri-City SHALL FILE a Second Amended Complaint containing only its first claim for declaratory relief, identical to its First Amended Complaint except without the second claim. This is the sole remaining claim in the related case. In the lead case, only Hammes's first claim for breach of the letter of intent against Tri-C ity remains. The parties SHALL APPEAR at the final pretrial conference currently set for 1/26/12 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6. Opposition to Tri-City's 101 motion for sanctions due by 1/9/2012 and Reply due by 1/16/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/13/11. (lmt)
July 11, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) granting in part and denying in part 38 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; (2) denying 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief: the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for partial summary jud gment as to Plaintiffs' claims for breach of the ground lease and space lease, breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, fraud, tortious interference with the space lease, and promissory estoppel. The Court DENIES Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment as to HC's claim for breach of the letter of intent. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/11/11. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammes Company Healthcare, LLC et al v. Tri-City Healthcare District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hammes Company Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: J. David Bournazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HC Tri-City I, LLC
Represented By: J. David Bournazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-City Healthcare District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?