Peruta v. County of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Edward Peruta
Defendant: County of San Diego and William D Gore
Case Number: 3:2009cv02371
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and (2) granting 38 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment: the Court concludes that Defendant's policy does not infringe on Plaintiffs' right to bear arms or violate equal protection, the right to travel, the Privileges and Immunities Clause of Article IV, or due process. Accordingly, the Court denies Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and grants Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/10/10. (lmt)
June 25, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; the Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, which is attached as Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 16 . Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/25/10. (kaj)
January 14, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant William D. Gore's 3 Motion to Dismiss. Because Pla's Complaint alleges sufficient facts to state claims for relief that are plausible on their face, Dft's Motion to Dismiss is denied in its entirety. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/14/2010. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peruta v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Peruta
Represented By: Paul H Neuharth, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?