Nourn v. Lattimore

Petitioner: Ny Nourn
Respondent: M. Lattimore
Case Number: 3:2009cv02456
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Report and Recommendations Denying Writ of Habeas Corpus is adopted and that the Certificate of Appealability is denied.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
September 16, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Appealability Denied. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/15/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
June 14, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2010, Replies due by 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/14/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
October 30, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERING Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/30/2009. (Bradley, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/4/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nourn v. Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ny Nourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. Lattimore
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?