Milano v. Aguilerra et al

Plaintiff: Ruth Milano
Defendant: Rolondo Aguilerra, United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02469
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 65 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside, Alter or Amend Judgment. Because Plaintiff fails to demonstrate entitlement to reconsideration under Rule 59(e), the Court DENIES her motion. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/1/2013. (sjt)(jrd)
March 8, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying as Moot 60 Joint Motion to Continue Pretrial Dates. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this order.Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/7/2013. (sjt)
June 15, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss certain defendants and claims form plaintiff's first amended complaint for damages, and to strike certain allegations. The Motion is Granted insofar as all claims asserted against Defendants Rolondo Aguilerra and United States Department of Defense are Dismissed With Prejudice and Plaintiffs request for punitive damages is Stricken. In all other respects, Defendants motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/15/2011. (mtb)
February 14, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part (Doc. 12 ) Defendants' Ex Parte Application; Granting In Part and Denying In Part (Doc. 8 ) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Granting (Doc. 8 ) Defendants' Motion to Strike; and Granting Leave to Amend. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, she must do so no later than February 28, 2011. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/14/2011. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milano v. Aguilerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Milano
Represented By: Robert A Waller, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolondo Aguilerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?