Hoffman v. American Society for Techion-Israel Institute of Technology, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Stanley Hoffman
Defendant: American Society for Techion-Israel Institute of Technology, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company and Ronnie Pallay
Case Number: 3:2009cv02482
Filed: November 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:1104 Recovery of Benefits to Employee
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 132 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/16/2014. (knb)
July 23, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 119 Ex Parte Motion to Reopen Case; and (2) Setting Briefing Schedule. Plainitff may file a supplemental brief by 8/19/2013. Defendtants may file a response by 9/9/2013, Plaintiff may file a reply by 9/23/2013. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/23/2013. (knb)
March 27, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Plaintiff's 103 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment; (2) Dismissing Remaining Claim for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff may move to re-open this action if the remaining claim ripens for review. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/26/2013.(knb)
February 21, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted in favor of MetLife on Plaintiff's first claim. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/21/2013. (knb)
February 12, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. First Reliance is granted summary judgment on the first claim and denied as moot on the third and fourth claims. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/12/2013. (knb)(jrd)
January 24, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Defendants' 61 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: Severance Benefits; and (2) Denying Plaintiff's 60 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: Severance Benefits. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/23/2013. (knb)
January 2, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 84 Ex Parte Application to Modify Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/28/2012. (knb)
December 18, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 79 Ex Parte Application to Strike or Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Defendants on the Life Insurance Benefits; (2) Denying as Untimely Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Defendants on the Life Insurance Benefits. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/18/2012. (knb)
August 22, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss in Part the First Amended Complaint. The third and fourth claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/21/2012. (knb)
November 16, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss and Granting 24 25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. If Plaintiffs wish to amend the dismissed claims, they must file a Second Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. John P Stennett of Stennett & Casino is substituted in as Counsel of Record for Stanley Hoffman. Attorney George de la Flor is no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/16/11. (ecs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. American Society for Techion-Israel Institute of Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Hoffman
Represented By: George Louis De La Flor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Society for Techion-Israel Institute of Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Pallay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?