Rojas-Vega v. Cejka et al

Plaintiff: Dany Rojas-Vega
Defendant: T Diane Cejka and Wayne K Willis
Case Number: 3:2009cv02489
Filed: November 5, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sua Sponte Dismissing Third Amended Complaint without Leave to Amend for Failing to State a Claim (Doc. No. 26 ). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/10/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
February 22, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Sua Sponte Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim; Denying 14 Motion for Court Order to Serve Complaint. Plaintiff is granted forty-five days from the date this Order is filed to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/21/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)(jrd)(mam).
April 15, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; (2) Sua Sponte Dismissing 1 Complaint for Failing to State a Claim without Prejudice; (3) Denying 7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; (4) Denying [3-2] Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Plaintiff is Granted forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order is filed to file an amended complaint.Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas-Vega v. Cejka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dany Rojas-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Diane Cejka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne K Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?