Cota v. Scribner et al

Plaintiff: David J. Cota
Defendant: L. E. Scribner, G Stanton, Crabtree, E. Duarte, M Tamayo and R. Bishop
Case Number: 3:2009cv02507
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses from Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/21/13. (cge)
February 16, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 69 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The Court will, in due course, exercise its discretion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1) and randomly select a volunteer attorney from the Courts Pro Bono Panel to represent Plaintiff dur ing the course of further proceedings before this Court. Once Pro Bono Counsel has been selected, the Court will issue an Order Appointing Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/16/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
October 26, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING PRIOR ORDER 59 ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 55 Report and Recommendation and granting 51 Motion to Dismiss filed defendants. The Court amends its order to remove the issuance of the Certificate of Appealability. Defendants need to file answers to surviving claims by 11/28/11. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/26/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
October 17, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 55 ; granting defendants' motion to dismiss 51 ; and issuing certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/14/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
March 28, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 46 Motion for Order to File Amended Complaint; and denying 47 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to file his amended complai nt. Plaintiff may amend his complaint in accordance with this Order, this Court's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 35), and Judge Benitez's Order (ECF No. 42) on or before April 19, 2011. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion directing the Pelican Bay prison staff to file Plaintiff's amended complaint at its current length, so long as the body of the complaint constitutes no more than 35 pages and the additional exhibits constitute no more than 95 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 03/28/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
February 14, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 35 Report and Recommendation in its entirety over Plaintiff's objections and grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff may amend his Complaint in accordance with the Report and Recommendation on or before March 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/14/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
December 8, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 35 Report and Recommendations in its entirety and grants in part and denies in part Defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/7/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
November 10, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for an Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 20 MOTION to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2010, Replies due by 12/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/10/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (jrl).
May 26, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 31 Motion for Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/26/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cota v. Scribner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Cota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. E. Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Tamayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?