Spencer v. Lattimore et al

Petitioner: Julie Lynn Spencer
Respondent: Unknown,, Mary Lattimore, Edmund G Brown, Jr and Javier Cavazos
Case Number: 3:2009cv02541
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Madera
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 32 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Re: Denial of Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus. The findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge presented in the Report and Recommendation are Adopted in their entirety. The instant petition is Denied with prejudice in its entirety. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
September 20, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 14 Report and Recommendation and Denying 13 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents shall file an Answer to the Petition. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/19/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
January 3, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice: if Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, she must submit, no later than 3/8/11, a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or with adequate prood of her inability to pay the fee and a Second Amended Petition. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner an IFP application and a Second Amended Petition form. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/3/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; IFP and 2254 form sent)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Lattimore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julie Lynn Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary Lattimore
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G Brown, Jr
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Javier Cavazos
Represented By: David Delgado-Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?