Guadarrama v. Small

Petitioner: Jorge Guadarrama
Respondent: Larry Small
Case Number: 3:2009cv02544
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/13/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
March 7, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Appealability Denied. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/7/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
September 27, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
August 10, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 33 Motion to Disqualify District Judge Roger T. Benitez. Petitioner's request to disqualify Judge Porter is addressed by separate order of the Court. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/9/2010.(knh)
August 9, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING, IN PART, PETITONER'S 33 MOTION TO DISQUALIFY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PORTER AND DISTRICT JUDGE BENITEZ FROM CASE. The Court DENIES the motion for disqualification as to Judge Porter. The Court will issue a seperate order as to the requested disqualification of Judge Benitez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 8/9/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
May 19, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 5/19/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guadarrama v. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Guadarrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Small
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?