Stevens v. Optimum Health Institute et al

Plaintiff: Nancy Stevens
Defendant: Optimum Health Institute, Robert Nees and Does 1 thorugh 20, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2009cv02565
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Any objections to evidence cited in this Order are overruled. Any objections to evidence not cited in this Order are denied as moot. Plaintiff's (Doc. 68 ) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part, as dis cussed in this Order. Defendants' (Doc. 69 ) Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment is denied. No later than 20 days from the date of this Order, the parties shall filed a joint status report identifying the issues that remain to be resolved in this case in light of the rulings in this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/24/2011. (mdc)
May 5, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' (Doc. 16 ) Amended Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/5/2010. (mdc)
January 6, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint which cures this deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within thirty days, the case will be closed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/6/2010. (mdc)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Optimum Health Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Stevens
Represented By: Amy B. Vandeveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimum Health Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 thorugh 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?