D.H. et al v. Poway Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: D.H. and K.H.
Defendant: Poway Unified School District and DOES 1 - 100, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2009cv02621
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/14/2014. (sjt)
December 19, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court Orders the District to provide D.H. with CART during classes at school. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/19/2013. (sjt)
June 12, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 36 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/11/2012. (mtb)
March 14, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/14/11. (rlu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.H. et al v. Poway Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.H.
Represented By: David M Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.H.
Represented By: David M Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poway Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?