O'Hines v. Brewer et al

Petitioner: James Lynn O'Hines
Respondent: Jan Brewer, Sugiyama and California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2009cv02626
Filed: November 18, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Third Amended Petition without prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/30/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
April 12, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Construing Document As Second Amended Petition; And (2) Dismissing Case Without Prejudice And With Leave To Amend: To have this case reopened, Petitioner must file a Third Amended Petition no later than 6/1/2010 which cures the pleading deficiencies noted in this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/9/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 2254 Third Amended Petition form also was sent to Petitioner.) (mdc)
February 4, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 5 ) and (2) Dismissing Case Without Prejudice: To have this case reopened, Petitioner must file a Second Amended Petition no later than 4/6/2010 which remedies the pleading deficiencies noted in this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/4/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 2254 Second Amended Petition form also was sent to Petitioner.) (mdc) (av1).
December 1, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice: The Court dismisses the Petition without prejudice and with leave to amend. To have this case reopened, Petitioner must, no later than 1/21/2010: (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee OR submit adequate proof of h is inability to pay the fee, AND (2) File a First Amended Petition which cures the pleading deficiencies outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/1/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank IFP form and a blank 2254 First Amended Petition also were sent to the Petitioner.) (mdc) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Hines v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Lynn O'Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jan Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?