Paschelke v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Elijah Ben Paschelke
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2009cv02657
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Bernardino
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and Granting in-part and Denying in-part 22 Motion to Dismiss on the ground that Plaintiff has failed to exhaust his administrative remedies, and DISMISSES this case Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/11/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
March 16, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Providing Plaintiff Notice of Defendants' 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Wyatt v. Terhune and Setting Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff, if he chooses, may file an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and serve it upon Defendan ts' counsel of record no later than April 13, 2011. Defendants may file a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition, and serve it upon Plaintiff no later than April 20, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/16/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
May 24, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/24/2010. (IFP Package and summons prepared) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paschelke v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Ben Paschelke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?