Womack v. Metropolitan Transit System et al

Plaintiff: Robert C. Womack
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit System, Paul Jablonski, Wayne Terry, Mary Jane Greenland, San Diego Trolley Inc., William Burke, Larry Savoy, Frank Amezcua, Len Parham, Dave Adams, Terrance Joseph and Transit Enforcement Officers Association of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2009cv02679
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 82 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Denying 89 Rule 60(b)(2) Motion. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/27/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
May 24, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Amend or Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/24/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
February 28, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Although Womack has not served the remaining defendants, Womack's claims against them would fail for the same reasons. Therefore, the Court orders the Clerk to enter judgment against Womack and in favor of all defendants. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/28/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
October 4, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff Date and Compel Defendants to Comply with Discovery Requests. The depositions must be conducted by October 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/4/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
May 26, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 26 Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents and Denying Defendants' Request for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 5/26/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vet)
April 28, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/28/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack v. Metropolitan Transit System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit System
Represented By: J Rod Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Greenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Trolley Inc.
Represented By: J Rod Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Savoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Amezcua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Len Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit Enforcement Officers Association of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?