North County Communications Corporation v. Sprint Communications Company, L.P.

Plaintiff: North County Communications Corporation
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02685
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Application for Writ of Attachment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 05/11/11. (cge)
September 21, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying North County Communications Corporation's 21 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/21/2010. (knh)
April 12, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 13 Motion for More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/8/2010. (knh)
February 1, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to First Amended Complaint. Defendant Sprint Communications Company, L.P. answer due 2/16/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/1/2010. (tkl)(jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North County Communications Corporation v. Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North County Communications Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Gary Dicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?