Davidson v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Harriet Davidson
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., LandSafe Title Corporation and Does
Trustee: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02694
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 43 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 42 Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) calendar days from the date of this Order. Should Plaintiffs fail to amend the complaint within the time permitted or fail to address the deficiencies discussed in this Order, Plaintiffs' remaining claims will be dismissed with prejudice. If Plaintiffs decide to amend their complaint, no additional parties or causes of action shall be included without first filing a motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/29/11. (rlu)
July 23, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 27 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion to dismiss w/o prejudice is granted as to Plaintiffs' cause of action for: 1.) wrongful foreclosure, 2.) cancellation of the Trust Deeds, 3.) quiet title, and 4.) violation of CA Civil Code 789.3. Plaintiffs' cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty is dismissed w/ prejudice. Motion to dismiss is denied as to the causes of action for: 1.) violation of RESPA, section 26 05, 2.) violation of RESPA, section 2604, 3.) violation of TILA, 4.) violation of CA Business and Professions Code 17200 and 5.) fraud in the inducement. If Plaintiffs' choose to amend their complaint, Plaintiffs shall not add additional parties or causes of action w/o first filing a motion for leave to amend. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 7/23/2010. (jah)
March 16, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss. Court grants Dfts' motion to dismiss w/ prejudice as to Pla's cause of action for violation of CA Civil Code 2943(b)(1), grants the motion to dismiss w/o pre judice as Pla's causes of action for quiet title and declaratory relief; and denies motion to dismiss as to Pla's cause of action for violation of RESPA. Pla may amend the Complaint. Pla shall file the amended complaint no later than 20 days from the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/16/2010. (jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Davidson
Represented By: Shannon E. Oltarzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LandSafe Title Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?