Salameh et al v. Tarsadia Hotel et al

Plaintiff: Tamar Salameh and Real Estate 4 Hospitality, LLC
Defendant: Tarsadia Hotel, Tushar Patel, B.U. Patel, Gregory Casserly, 5th Rock LLC, MPK One, LLC, Playground Destination Properties, East West Bank and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02739
Filed: December 8, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2017 549 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 544 Plaintiff Salameh's Ex Parte Motion to Request Homestead Exemption. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/10/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 31, 2016 529 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Appearance at Examination and For Production of Documents Requested in Exhibit A. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 7/27/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/23/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
March 23, 2016 518 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 500 Defendants 5th Rock LLC and MPK One, LLC's Motion for Order of Sale Against Plaintiff Tamer Salameh. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/23/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 4, 2016 498 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting 487 Judgment Creditors' Application for Third Party Examination of Norman Nyberg; and (2) Denying as Moot Judgment Creditors' Application for Issuance of Civil Subpoena Duces Tecum. Judgment Creditors are instructed to confer with counsel for Mr. Nyberg (or Mr. Nyberg if he is unrepresented) and the Court Clerk assigned to judgment enforcement cases in this District to obtain a mutually-agreeable date and time for the examination, and then to submit a propose d order to this Court's chambers with a copy toopposing counsel. At that time, the Court will issue the Order compelling the examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/4/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
October 14, 2015 486 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 484 Report and Recommendation Granting in Part and Denying in Part 465 Motion for Order Determining Claims of Exemption: The Court adopts the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation, and denies the claims of exemption filed by Alexis Cosio, Cesar Mota, Aleksey and Diana Kats, Dale and Michele Curtis, Danon Slinkard and Benjamin Steigerwalt and grants the claims of exemptions filed by Eden Steigerwalt. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/14/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 16, 2015 401 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 399 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/16/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 31, 2014 245 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Re Tarsadia Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. The Court awards Defendants 5th Rock and MKP One, LLC attorneys' fees in the amount of $405,371.25 which breaks down to $358,490.00 for work per formed from December 14, 2009 through February 28, 2011, and $46,881.25 for attorneys' fees in connection with the instant request for attorneys' fees and for work performed in March and April 2011, November 2013 and March 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/31/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
March 22, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint re 91 , 93 , 96 , 98 , 99 , 111 , 113 , 122 , 132 . The Bank Defendants' (Bank of America, N.A., East West Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., XBR Financ ial Services, LLC, Independent Bank Corporation, Erskine Corp., Wintrust Financial Corporation) Motions to dismiss are granted, Tarsadia's Motion to dismiss is granted, and Playground's motion to dismiss is granted. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice and Plaintiffs are denied leave to amend. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/22/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
August 24, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Playground Destination Properties' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint on or before 09/10/2010. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/24/10. (lao)(jrl).
August 23, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (in Civil Case 10cv1231) and Denying 60 Playground Destination Properties' Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/23/10. (lao)(jrl).
July 20, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Bank Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint re 15 , 18 , 29 , 45 . Defendants East West, XBR, BofA, and Chase's motions to dismiss are granted without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file their Sec ond Amended Complaint after the Court rules on Defendant Playground's pending motion to dismiss. That motion is scheduled to be heard on August 13, 2010. Accordingly, Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint within 20 days of the Court's ruling on Defendant Playground's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/20/10. (lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salameh et al v. Tarsadia Hotel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Salameh
Represented By: Maria C Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Estate 4 Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Maria C Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarsadia Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tushar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.U. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Casserly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5th Rock LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPK One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playground Destination Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East West Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?