Cook et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al

Plaintiff: Christopher R. Cook and Debra K. Powers-Cook
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02757
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' (Doc. 21 ) Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is granted. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed Third Amended Complaint attached to Plaintiffs' Motion as Exhibit A by no later than ten days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/25/2011. (mdc)
July 7, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Wells Fargo's (Doc. 11 ) Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiff may file a motion for leave to amend the complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. In the event no motion is filed, the Court will close the case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/7/2010. (mdc)
March 26, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/26/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Cook
Represented By: Jesse T. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra K. Powers-Cook
Represented By: Jesse T. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: John C Dineen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?