Wallace v. Busch Entertainment Corp et al

Plaintiff: John B Wallace
Defendant: Busch Entertainment Corp and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02785
Filed: December 14, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The Court DENIES his motion for reconsideration in its entirety. The Court also DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiffs request to set a trial date. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/25/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Copy sent to address on file and address listed as return address on recent filing)(sjt) (jrl).
October 27, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 52 Defendants' Motion to Substitute Party as defendant. The Clerk of the Court shall substitute SWPE LLC as defendant in place of BEC. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/25/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
August 16, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/16/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Busch Entertainment Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busch Entertainment Corp
Represented By: Renata Ortiz Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?