The Medical Protective Company v. Erfani

Plaintiff: The Medical Protective Company
Defendant: Shervin Erfani
Case Number: 3:2009cv02833
Filed: December 17, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 49 Ex Parte Application for Default Judgment; and Denying 53 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/5/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
September 8, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Medical Protective Company has not met its burden as the moving party seeking summary judgment. Its motion for summary judgment is therefore Denied. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/8/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
November 5, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Intervene as Defendants. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/5/10. (lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Medical Protective Company v. Erfani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Medical Protective Company
Represented By: Jeffrey A Charlston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shervin Erfani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?