Thalheimer et al v. City of San Diego et al

Plaintiff: Phil Thalheimer, Associated Builders & Contractors PAC, Lincoln Club of San Diego County, Republican Party of San Diego and John Nienstedt, Sr.
Defendant: City of San Diego, Richard M. Valdez, W. Lee Biddle, Guillermo Cabrera, Clyde Fuller, Dorothy Leonard, Larry S. Westfall, Jerry Sanders, Jan Goldsmith and Elizabeth Maland
Case Number: 3:2009cv02862
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 137 Motion for Attorney Fees. Court awards fees and costs in the total amount of $272,697.97. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/26/2012. (jah)
January 20, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court rules as follows on the parties cross-motions for summary judgment: Count 1 (27.2938(a)) - can didates prohibited spending their own money prior to the 12-month period is granted for Plaintiffs; Count 2 (27.2938(a)) - making and accepting contributions prior to the 12-month period is granted for Defendants and denied for Plaintiffs; Count 3 (2 7.2935(a)) - $500 limit on individual contributions to candidates is granted for Defendants and denied for Plaintiffs; Count 4 (27.2950 & 27.2951) - ban on contributions to candidates by political parties is granted for Plaintiffs and denied for Defendants; Count 5 (27.2950 & 27.2951) - ban on contributions on candidates by non-individuals other than political parties is granted for Defendants and denied for Plaintiffs; Count 6 (27.2936(b)) - $500 limit on individual contributions to c ommittees making independent expenditures is granted for Plaintiffs, this does not include $500 limit on individual contributions to these committees to the extent those committees make direct contributions to candidates, which the City continue s to enforce; Count 7 (27.2936(b)) - ban on contributions by non-individuals to committees making independent expenditures is granted for Plaintiffs, this includes contributions by non-individuals to political parties making indenpendent expenditures ; Count 8 (27.2934(b)) - $1,000 limit on contributions to candidates by political parties is granted for Plaintiffs and denied for Defendants; Count 9 (27.2936(b)) - $500 individual limit on contributions to political parties making direct contributions to candidates is granted for Defendants and denied for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/20/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
September 3, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion for TRO; denying 95 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 9/3/10. (jpm)
April 28, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 70 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Vacate the Stay of Court's Order Enjoining Contributions by Political Parties to Their Candidates. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 4/28/2010. (jah) (jrl).
March 23, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant City of San Diego's 50 Motion for Immediate Stay of a Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 3/23/2010. (jah)
February 16, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminary injunction shall remain in full force and effect until further order of the Court. Because the City has not demonstrated a risk of monetary loss from the issuance of a preliminary injunction, no bond will be required. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 2/16/2010. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thalheimer et al v. City of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Thalheimer
Represented By: Gary D Leasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Builders & Contractors PAC
Represented By: Gary D Leasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln Club of San Diego County
Represented By: Gary D Leasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican Party of San Diego
Represented By: Gary D Leasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nienstedt, Sr.
Represented By: Gary D Leasure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Lee Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry S. Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Maland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?