Martinez et al v. The Welk Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hermenegildo Martinez, Wade Brent, Bob Moscato and Donnie Harmon
Defendant: The Welk Group, Inc., Welk Resorts, Welk Music Group, Inc., Jon Fredericks, Ron Sharp, Marc L. Luzzatto, Glenn Clinton, Jeff Edwards, Sean Coogan, Hank Flair, Lawrence Welk, Jr., Kevin Welk, William McGregor, Carl McKinzie, Richard Whitehouse, Kenny Hopkins, Soleil Communications and DOES
Case Number: 3:2009cv02883
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2013 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying in Part without Prejudice Counter-Defendant's 186 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 3/15/2013. (knb)
October 30, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 128 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/30/12. (cge)
April 26, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 04/26/12. (cge)
January 12, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's 81 Motion to Compel Arbitration. With regard to the alleged conflict of interest, Defendants (if they so choose) must file their motion to disqualify counsel within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/12/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
June 2, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 60 Defendants' Motion to Strike and (2) Denying 61 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/2/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
January 11, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part 42 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 47 Motion to Strike. For the reasons stated herein, the Court hereby grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to dismiss, and grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to strike. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint addressing the deficienciesas noted above within 21 days from the date of this Order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/11/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. The Welk Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermenegildo Martinez
Represented By: Steven Bruce Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Brent
Represented By: Steven Bruce Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Moscato
Represented By: Steven Bruce Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Harmon
Represented By: Steven Bruce Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Welk Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welk Resorts
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welk Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Fredericks
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Sharp
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Luzzatto
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Clinton
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Edwards
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Coogan
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hank Flair
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Welk, Jr.
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Welk
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McGregor
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl McKinzie
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Whitehouse
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Hopkins
Represented By: Marie Burke Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soleil Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?