Albertson v. Monumental Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: James O Albertson
Defendant: Monumental Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00021
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 32 Motion to Transfer Case to Southern District of California (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2010.]
September 15, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte continuing hearing date on 32 motion to transfer venue pursuant to 45 Ex Parte Application and 47 Motion to Shorten Time. Hearing on the motion to transfer venue will be on October 30, 2009; plaintiff's opposition papers shall be filed on or before September 18, 2009; defendant's reply papers shall be filed and served on or before October 2, 2009. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2010.]
July 16, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 27 Dismissing Complaint as to Globe Life & Accident Insurance Company with Prejudice. Globe Life and Accident Insurance Company terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)[Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2010.]
June 11, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice request for order transferring action contained within 15 Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/8/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)[Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2010.]
April 7, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Continue (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albertson v. Monumental Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O Albertson
Represented By: Patric Harry Ray Weddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monumental Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean P Nalty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?