Sanchez v. Superior Court of The State of California County of San Diego North County Division et al

Plaintiff: Alejandro Sanchez
Defendant: Superior Court of The State of California County of San Diego North County Division, Irma Cota, Phil Lenowsky, Kevin Ellis, George E. Lopez, Melissa Brown, Diane Seaberg, Rick Martinez, Adriana Andres-Paulson, Andres Martin, Clyde H. Beck Jr., Emilio Lopez-Ramirez, Shohre Zaheri, Walt Steffen, North County Health Services and DOES 1-100
Case Number: 3:2010cv00218
Filed: January 28, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted with prejudice and that the Plaintiff's Request forCertificate of Appealability is denied as moot.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
May 27, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The Court Denies Plaintiff's motion to amend (Docket No. 39 ); and Grants Defendants' motions to dismiss (Doc ket Nos. 31 , 27 ) and Denies as Moot 27 Motion to Strike. The claims against Defendant Superior Court in this case are Dismissed with Prejudice. The claims against Defendants Irma Cota, Phil Lenowsky, Kevin Ellis, George E. Lopez, Melissa Brown, Diane Seaberg, Rick Martinez, Adriana Andres-Paulson, Andres Martin, Clyde H. Beck, Jr., Emigdio Lopez-Ramirez (sued as Emilio Lopez-Ramirez), Shohre Zaheri, Walt Steffen, and North County Health Services (the "NCHS Defendants") are Dismis sed without Prejudice. Plaintiff may amend his Complaint to correct the deficient allegations against the NCHS Defendants only, but must file such amended complaint no later than June 11, 2010. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
April 15, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Superior Court of The State of California County of San Diego North County Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of The State of California County of San Diego North County Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Cota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Lenowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George E. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Seaberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Andres-Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde H. Beck Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Lopez-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shohre Zaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North County Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?