Bryant v. Ochoa et al

Plaintiff: Stanford Paul Bryant
Defendant: Tim Ochoa, James Tilton, Gerald J Janda, Larry Scribner, M McNair, V Villa, Drake, R Nelson, R Madden, S Atkins, T Armstrong, R Widmann, J Manning, R Lizarraga and John Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv00273
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Bernard G. Skomal to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. All future conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge Skomal, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before the District Judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 10cv273 W (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 03/28/14. Motions set before Jill L. Burkhardt.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jcj)
October 13, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT - the Court dismisses this action for all the reasons set forth in the Court's June 10, 2010 Order and for failing to comply with the Court's August 13, 2010 Order. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the Defendants and close the file (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
July 12, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 59(e) (Docs. 10 , 12 ). The Court Grants Plaintiff an extension of time in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint must be filed with the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/9/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
June 10, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Defendants for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C §§1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b). However, Plaintiff is Granted thirty (30) days leave from the date this Order is filed to either; (1) file a Second Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading; (2) notify the Court of his intention to proceed with this action against Defendants Ochoa and Janda. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/10/2010. (blank forms mailed to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Ochoa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Paul Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald J Janda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M McNair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Widmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?