Watkinson v. MortgageIT, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Don Tobin Watkinson
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00327
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 31 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Strike. Court dismisses w/ prejudice the following causes of action: 1.) 1st cause of action to extent it alleges a TILA claim for damages, 2.) 2nd cause of action for RESPA violations, 3.) 3rd cause of action for recission, 4.) 7th cause of action to extent it alleges a duty of care for a violation other than Dft's alleged misstatement of Pla's incom e and value of the Property on the loan application, and 5.) 8th and 9th causes of action for resulting and constructive trusts. Court dismisses w/ leave to amend the following causes of action: 1.) 1st cause of action to extent it alleges a TILA cla im for recission, 2.) 4th cause of action for violation of the unfair competition law, 3.) 5th cause of action for unjust enrichment, and 4.) 6th cause of action for predatory lending. Court denies the motion to dismiss in all other regards. Plaintif f shall have 30 days from the filing of this Order to file a First Amended Complaint. Court strikes w/ prejudice paragraphs 59,60, and 61 of the Complaint. Court denies the motion to strike in all other respects. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 6/1/2010. (jah) (jrl).
February 9, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/9/10 ORDERING that this case is TRANSFERRED to U.S. District Court Southern District of California. The Court further orders that Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS 6 and MOTION TO STRIKE 10 are DENIED, without prejudice, as moot. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/10/2010.]
January 15, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/15/2010 ORDERING that the court does not find oral argument necessary re 6 10 Motions. The hearings currently set for 1/25/2010 are VACATED.(Matson, R)[Transferred from California Eastern on 2/10/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkinson v. MortgageIT, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageIT, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine H Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Tobin Watkinson
Represented By: Mitchell Luke Abdallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?